All public logs
Combined display of all available logs of Powerbase. You can narrow down the view by selecting a log type, the username (case-sensitive), or the affected page (also case-sensitive).
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)- 15:28, 7 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Simon webley.jpg (Simon Webley, trustee of the Institute for Policy Research)
- 09:50, 6 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:YBF leaflet.jpg (A leaflet distributed in the UK by the Young Britons' Foundation at the time of the 2010 General election.)
- 07:50, 6 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Fakecharities.org screen capture 2011-5-6-8-51-48.png (Fakecharities.org screencapture, taken 6 May 2011. the domain is registered to Chris Mounsey of the Libertarian Party)
- 07:45, 6 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Chris Mounsey.jpg (The Libertarian Party's Chris Mounsey on the BBC's ''Daily Politics'' show, Wednesday, 14 April 2010)
- 16:40, 5 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Lord-Vinson-at-Egger-300x202.jpg (Nigel Vinson addresses the All-Party Parliamentary Group for the Wood Panel Industry.)
- 10:12, 4 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Www.charity-commission.gov.uk screen capture 2011-5-4-11-14-50.png (Charity Commission overview of Institute for Policy Research financial and filing history, screen capture created 4 May 2011)
- 09:41, 4 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Www.charity-commission.gov.uk screen capture 2011-5-4-10-44-9.png (Charity Commission overview of Nigel Vinson Charitable Trust financial and filing history)
- 09:21, 4 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:On top of The hill - Archive Titles - Building 1304500207008.png (Kate Davies biographical box from ''Building'' magazine 2004.)
- 09:16, 4 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Kate Davies (housing official) (content before blanking was: "right|thumb|300px|[[Kate Marshall as 'General Secretary' of the RCP in The next step, November 1984, p. 23]] File:Kate Davies-Ferdinand Mount-Philippa Stroud.jpg|thumb|right|300px|...")
- 07:58, 4 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:John Gillott-Innogen.jpg (John Gillott from the Innogen website, 2011.)
- 20:09, 2 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Rl head.jpg (Regester Larkin logo, circa 2011<ref>Retrieved from the Regester Larkin Website on 2 May 2011, http://www.regesterlarkin.com/</ref>)
- 14:51, 2 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Regester Larkin Home Page 1304347947027.png (Regester Larkin homepage circa 2003<ref>Retrieved from the Internet Archive of 7 August 2003 http://replay.web.archive.org/20020807002303/http://www.regesterlarkin.com/</ref>)
- 08:44, 2 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Ellenraphael 2002.jpg (Ellen Raphael in 2002 at the time she worked for Regester Larkin)
- 08:29, 2 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Tracey brown 2001.jpg (Tracey Brown in 2001 at the time of her employment with Regester Larkin.)
- 15:53, 1 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Ellen Raphael.jpg (Ellen Raphael of Sense About Science a project linked to the LM network)
- 09:11, 1 May 2011 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Laurence M. Mead (content before blanking was: "Lawrence M. Mead is Professor of Politics at New York University, where he teaches public policy and American government. According to his biography on the Welfare Reform Academy site: :Professor Mead is an expert on...")
- 11:50, 25 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Chicago School of Economics to Chicago school of economics
- 11:49, 25 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Austrian School of Economics to Austrian school of economics
- 09:29, 21 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Joe McCarthy to Joseph McCarthy
- 08:49, 21 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Simon-Clark-Portrait.jpg (Simon Clark of tobacco industry funded FOREST and formerly of the Media Monitoring Unit)
- 08:40, 21 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Freedom zone.jpg (The 'Freedom Zone' a project of FOREST via its campaign The Free Society)
- 07:54, 19 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page David Project to The David Project
- 08:00, 18 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Accuracy In Media to Accuracy in Media
- 08:00, 13 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:Media Smart:Media Smart's Relationship with Policy Makers (content was: "Media Smart seems to have a good relationship with its policy makers. They speak very highly of the work that Media Smart does and believe it is a..." (and the only contributor was "Leigh Gallagher"))
- 07:59, 13 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:Media Smart: RobinBlake (content was: "==Robin Blake== Robin Blake, Head of Media Literacy at Ofcom Ofcom has a duty to promote media literacy to the general public, Robin’s duties ..." (and the only contributor was "Kirstin Walker"))
- 19:40, 12 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:20 Years of Resistance IFM badge.png (Irish Freedom Movement badge, 'Ireland: 20 Years of Resistance' from 1988)
- 17:23, 12 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Easter 1982 IFM badge.png (Badge commemorating the first Irish Freedom Movement visit to the North of Ireland at Easter 1982)
- 08:07, 12 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Ernst & Young to Ernst and Young
- 12:35, 11 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Deloitte & Touche to Deloitte and Touche
- 14:36, 7 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Andrew Garfield- Glevum to Andrew Garfield- Glevum
- 14:35, 7 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Colonel Jeff Haynes, U.S. Marine Corps (Ret.) to Jeff Haynes
- 14:29, 7 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded a new version of File:Democracy Institute Social Network Analysis.jpg (Reverted to version as of 08:06, 7 April 2011)
- 18:46, 6 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Mayes-restraint.jpg (''Restraint of Revelation'', published by Spiked and written by Tessa Mayes of the LM network)
- 09:36, 5 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Hoey Joa.jpg (Joan Hoey of the Economist Intelligence Unit, formerly known as Joan Phillips of the Revolutionary Communist Party)
- 07:43, 5 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:European voice No 1.gif (European Voice Vol. 1, No. 1)
- 15:49, 4 April 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Teaching About Terrorism: University of Thames Valley to Teaching About Terrorism: Thames Valley University
- 17:44, 27 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Statistical Assessment Service to Statistical Assessment Service
- 16:59, 26 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:John Fitzpatrick.jpg (John Fitzpatrick addresses the Battle of Ideas in 2008. Fellow LM network associate Tessa Mayes in the background.)
- 09:13, 25 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:AndrewCalCutt.JPG (Andrew Calcutt, associate of the LM network)
- 09:06, 25 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Manjit Kumar.jpg (Manjit Kumar, LM Network associate)
- 11:45, 24 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) moved page Lanesborough Lunches to Lanesborough Luncheons
- 10:25, 24 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:01 Risk of freedom briefing.jpg (''Risk of Freedom Briefing'' No. 1, October 1999, featuring an extract from a talk by Frank Furedi of the LM network at the first Lanesborough Lunch. both the lunches and the briefing were funded by the tobacco industry.)
- 09:40, 24 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Risk of Freedom 12-2002.jpg (''Risk of Freedom Briefing'', edited by Roger Scruton, funded by Japan Tobacco International. Issue 12, July 2002 showing contributions from Frank Furedi, Mike Fitzpatrick and Bill Durodie of the LM network.)
- 21:40, 23 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:ESEF-small-web.archive.org screen capture 2011-3-23-20-41-2.png (ESEF claim to take no corporate funding, circa 1997. Retrieved from the Internet archive of 24 December 1997: http://web.archive.org/web/19971224164327/esef.org/mission.htm)
- 21:38, 23 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Eseflogo.gif (European Science and Environment Forum logo circa 1997)
- 07:10, 23 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Durodie1.jpg (Durodie's 1999 pamphlet for the Tobacco industry funded European Science and Environment Forum)
- 07:03, 23 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Scibarriers.jpg (Durodie at the Battle of Ideas speaking on: What are the barriers to science in the 21st century ?Institute of Ideas London, UK Oct 28th, 2007)
- 09:36, 22 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Kendra Okonski2.jpg (Kendra Okonski in image from the International Policy Network website 2011.)
- 09:36, 22 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Kendra okonski 2001.JPG (Kendra Okonski, Competitive Enterprise Institute/International Policy Network, 2001)
- 09:35, 22 March 2011 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Adapt or Die.jpg (''Adapt or Die'', Edited by Kendra Okonski, International Policy Network, 2003)