All public logs
Combined display of all available logs of Powerbase. You can narrow down the view by selecting a log type, the username (case-sensitive), or the affected page (also case-sensitive).
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)- 08:44, 17 July 2013 David (talk | contribs) moved page Alber & Geiger to Alber and Geiger (remove ampersand)
- 08:44, 17 July 2013 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Alber and Geiger (content was: "#RedirectAlber & Geiger" (and the only contributor was "David"))
- 05:22, 22 June 2013 David (talk | contribs) moved page Nablus Coordination & Liaison Administration to Nablus Coordination and Liaison Administration
- 13:45, 6 June 2013 David (talk | contribs) moved page George G. Weston to George Garfield Weston
- 13:07, 4 June 2013 David (talk | contribs) moved page Galen Weston to Willard Gordon Galen Weston
- 11:33, 15 May 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Sugar bureau logo.gif (The logo of the Sugar Bureau before it was rebranded as Sugar Nutrition UK)
- 13:18, 11 April 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Living Marxism cover-Dec 1989-No 14.jpg (Living Marxism no 14 December 1989)
- 13:12, 11 April 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Living Marxism cover-Oct1989-No 12.jpg (Living Marxism no 12 October 1989)
- 11:08, 11 April 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Living Marxism cover-Dec 1988-No 2.jpg (Living Marxism Issue no 2 December 1988)
- 12:10, 8 March 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:David Leigh-Death of the department that never was-IRD-Guardian-27 Jan 1978.jpg (Announcing the death of the covert Information Research Department, 1978: David Leigh 'Death of the department that never was'. ''The Guardian'', 27 January 1978, p. 13)
- 16:43, 7 March 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Leigh-Lashmar-Revealed-How MI5 vets BBC staff-observer-August 1985.jpg (MI5 vetting revealed: David Leigh and Paul Lashmar 'Revealed: How MI5 vets BBC staff', ''The Observer'', 18 August 1985, p. 1. )
- 11:06, 18 February 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:L-observateur-Jerusalem Liberee-4 June 1967.jpg (The cover of L'Observateur du Moyen Orient et de L'Afrique after the occupation of East Jerusalem by Israeli forces in the Six Day War, 9 june 1967, Vol XVI No. 23.)
- 00:52, 13 February 2013 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Howard Davies (academic and GM advocate) (content before blanking was: "#REDIRECT Howard Davies (former member of EFSA GMO Panel)")
- 13:58, 31 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Progressive Vision Campaigning for a freer society 20130131 145645 copy.png (The logo of the now defunct think tank Progressive Vision)
- 17:34, 24 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:New Middle east cover.jpeg (Cover of ''The New Middle East'' edited by Jon Kimche, 1971.)
- 08:23, 23 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Kimche Times 1967 cover of JO.jpg (Cover of the controversial edition of the Jewish Observer and Middle East Review which led to Jon Kimche being sacked as editor by the Zionist Federation in March 1967. Source: The News Team 'An Editor challenges Instruction: Banned article...)
- 14:17, 15 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Jon Kimche Canadian Jewish Chronicle 8 Sept 1967.jpg (Jon Kimche in the Canadian Jewish Chronicle Review, on his appointment as correspondent for that paper. [http://news.google.com/newspapers?nid=883&dat=19670908&id=q6haAAAAIBAJ&sjid=wUsDAAAAIBAJ&pg=3933,5963950 Jon Kimche joins Chronicle Review...)
- 10:12, 13 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) moved page RIKILT to RIKILT Wageningen UR
- 00:58, 13 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Institute of Food Safety (RIKILT) (content was: "#REDIRECT RIKILT" (and the only contributor was "Lucy Brown"))
- 00:57, 13 January 2013 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Institute of Food Safety (content was: "#REDIRECT RIKILT" (and the only contributor was "Lucy Brown"))
- 22:55, 24 December 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:ZF logo circa 2012.jpeg (Logo of the Zionist Federation, circa 2012, Retrieved from http://www.zionist.org.uk, 24 December 2012)
- 21:23, 24 December 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:ZF logo circa 2006.png (Logo from the Zionist Federation website circa 2006. Retrieved from the Internet Archive of 2 February 2006 at: http://web.archive.org/web/20060202164940/http://www.zionist.org.uk/Main/about.php)
- 12:47, 11 December 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Pinchas Buchris to Pinchas Barel-Buchris
- 18:40, 2 December 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page James Angleton to James Jesus Angleton
- 17:34, 30 November 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page STRATUM to Strategic Tissue Repository Alliance through Unified Methods
- 13:07, 21 November 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Lobbying regulation - chronology to Lobbying regulation - chronology 2010-2019
- 00:57, 17 November 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Jonathan Sacerdoti - United Kingdom - LinkedIn.png (Jonathan Sacerdoti, LinkedIn profile which fails to mention his roles at the Zionist Federation and the Board of Deputies of British Jews, Screengrab taken 16 November 2012.)
- 10:03, 7 November 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:INSS logo.gif (The logo of the Institute for National Security Studies at Tel Aviv University.)
- 09:02, 5 November 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Luke Akehurst.jpeg (Luke Akehurst, right wing Labour Party activist and candidate, Israel lobbyist and Director of We Believe in Israel a project of BICOM)
- 09:28, 17 October 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Christoph loevenich copy.jpg (Christoph Lövenich of Netzwerk Rauchen)
- 09:18, 17 October 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Christoph Lövenich M.A.-Biog-Netzwerk Rauchen copy.jpg (Christoph Lövenich biographical note on the Netzwerk Rauchen website, which shows his connections to pro-tobacco lobby groups. )
- 09:15, 17 October 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Battle of Ideas 2011 speaker Christoph Lövenich copy.jpg (Christoph Lövenich biographical note on the Battle of Ideas website, which fails to mention his connections to pro-tobacco lobby groups. )
- 08:45, 17 October 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page FORCES to FORCES International
- 08:25, 17 October 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Sense about Science – Equipping people to make sense of science and evidence copy.jpg (Sense About Science logo - associated with the LM network)
- 08:05, 4 September 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Daniel Shapiro to Daniel Shapiro (US Ambassador)
- 15:13, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:McLarty Associates to McLarty Associates over redirect
- 15:13, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Leo Tilman to Leo Tilman over redirect
- 15:11, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:James Lyle to James Lyle over redirect
- 15:06, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Anne Gantén to Anne Gantén over redirect
- 14:32, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:John R. Drexel IV to John R. Drexel IV over redirect
- 13:01, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Atlantic Partnership: People to Atlantic Partnership: People
- 13:00, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Atlantic Partnership: Meg Allen to Meg Allen over redirect
- 13:00, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Susannah Vila to Susannah Vila over redirect
- 12:28, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Martin Zelder to Martin Zelder over redirect
- 12:21, 23 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:Jason Clemens to Jason Clemens over redirect
- 22:45, 22 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Shook, Hardy & Bacon to Shook, Hardy and Bacon
- 09:27, 22 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page File:Bicom Appointments, 13 June 2012.pdf (Deleted old revision 20120821213056!Bicom_Appointments,_13_June_2012.pdf)
- 08:28, 20 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Snowdon Video to Snowdon Video Production Limited
- 21:11, 14 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:NUS 90th Anniverary Interviews- Lorna Fitzsimons - YouTube.png (Lorna Fitzsimons former head of Israel lobby group BICOM and former Labour MP for Rochdale in 2012.)
- 21:41, 12 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Keren Hayesod to Keren Hayesod - United Israel Appeal