User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 18:46, 8 February 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+88) . . Manuel Valls (→On Islam in general)
- 18:43, 8 February 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-409) . . Manuel Valls
- 18:42, 8 February 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Manuel Valls (→On Islam in general)
- 18:40, 8 February 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-300) . . Alain Finkielkraut (current)
- 10:39, 29 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . LM network: Bibliography (→D) (current)
- 13:19, 24 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . Families Against Stress and Trauma
- 12:54, 24 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Families Against Stress and Trauma (→People)
- 12:09, 22 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+223) . . Active Change Foundation (→External resources) (current)
- 12:07, 22 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+409) . . Active Change Foundation (→Funders and Partners)
- 09:13, 21 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+83) . . Secret Intelligence Service (→External Resources)
- 09:43, 10 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (-512) . . Revolutionary Communist Party (→1984) (current)
- 09:57, 20 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Institute for Statecraft (→Counter radicalisation) (current)
- 14:06, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Active Change Foundation (→People)
- 13:59, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+55) . . Active Change Foundation
- 12:18, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . Prevent Strategy - Local Delivery Best Practice Catalogue (→Young people) (current)
- 12:16, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,886) . . Active Change Foundation
- 11:58, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+2,527) . . Active Change Foundation
- 11:45, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Lesley Simm (→Company directorships) (current)
- 11:44, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Lesley Simm
- 11:43, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+125) . . Institute for Statecraft (→Counter radicalisation)
- 11:41, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Institute for Statecraft (→Affiliations)
- 11:41, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+117) . . Young Leaders Programme (current)
- 11:22, 18 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+155) . . Active Change Foundation
- 10:08, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Military Strategic Effects
- 10:08, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+150) . . Military Strategic Effects
- 09:42, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Military Strategic Effects
- 09:42, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Military Strategic Effects (→People)
- 09:39, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Military Strategic Effects (→People)
- 09:34, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+464) . . Military Strategic Effects
- 09:29, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+702) . . N Military Strategic Effects (Created page with " ==People== *15th March 2018 - Air Commodore N J Colman OBE to be Head Military Strategic Effects in the Ministry of Defence in April 2018 in succession to Air Commodore J...")
- 09:27, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+77) . . Targeting and Information Operations (current)
- 10:46, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . Ministry of Defence (→Resources)
- 10:45, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+67) . . N File:David Miller 2018-06239.pdf (Ministry of Defence FoI disclosure on information related units) (current)
- 10:41, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Ministry of Defence (→Current)
- 10:41, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Ministry of Defence (→Current)
- 10:40, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+220) . . Ministry of Defence (→Propaganda and information control)
- 10:36, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+832) . . Ministry of Defence (→Lobbying firms)
- 09:52, 29 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+451) . . Integrity Initiative (current)
- 13:12, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Andy Pryce (→Disinformation - the playbook and how to fight it: 2018 Brussels DisinfoLab - 11 April 2018)
- 15:01, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Andy Pryce (→European Parliament Schuman Trainees Committee - Luxembourg - 12 April 2018=)
- 14:58, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+478) . . N Integrity Initiative (Created page with "The Integrity Initiative was created in 2015. It is run by the Institute for Statecraft. ==Activities== ==Affiliations== ===Partners=== Beacon Project | CEPA...")
- 13:34, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,579) . . Andy Pryce (→European Parliament Schuman Trainees Committee - Luxembourg - April 2018)
- 13:23, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+226) . . Andy Pryce (→Affiliations)
- 13:20, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Andy Pryce (→European Parliament Schuman Trainees Committee - Luxembourg - April 2018)
- 13:17, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,100) . . Andy Pryce (→Activities)
- 13:11, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Andy Pryce (→Skripal affair propaganda)
- 13:11, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Andy Pryce (→Skripal affair)
- 13:07, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Andy Pryce
- 13:05, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+153) . . Andy Pryce
- 13:01, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+90) . . N File:Screenshot 2018-11-27 at 12.41.03.png (Andy Pryce, Head of Counter Disinformation and Media Development, FCO, March 2018.) (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)