User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 09:29, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+702) . . N Military Strategic Effects (Created page with " ==People== *15th March 2018 - Air Commodore N J Colman OBE to be Head Military Strategic Effects in the Ministry of Defence in April 2018 in succession to Air Commodore J...")
- 09:27, 17 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+77) . . Targeting and Information Operations (current)
- 10:46, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . Ministry of Defence (→Resources)
- 10:45, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+67) . . N File:David Miller 2018-06239.pdf (Ministry of Defence FoI disclosure on information related units) (current)
- 10:41, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Ministry of Defence (→Current)
- 10:41, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Ministry of Defence (→Current)
- 10:40, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+220) . . Ministry of Defence (→Propaganda and information control)
- 10:36, 13 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+832) . . Ministry of Defence (→Lobbying firms)
- 09:52, 29 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+451) . . Integrity Initiative (current)
- 13:12, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Andy Pryce (→Disinformation - the playbook and how to fight it: 2018 Brussels DisinfoLab - 11 April 2018)
- 15:01, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Andy Pryce (→European Parliament Schuman Trainees Committee - Luxembourg - 12 April 2018=)
- 14:58, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+478) . . N Integrity Initiative (Created page with "The Integrity Initiative was created in 2015. It is run by the Institute for Statecraft. ==Activities== ==Affiliations== ===Partners=== Beacon Project | CEPA...")
- 13:34, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,579) . . Andy Pryce (→European Parliament Schuman Trainees Committee - Luxembourg - April 2018)
- 13:23, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+226) . . Andy Pryce (→Affiliations)
- 13:20, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Andy Pryce (→European Parliament Schuman Trainees Committee - Luxembourg - April 2018)
- 13:17, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,100) . . Andy Pryce (→Activities)
- 13:11, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Andy Pryce (→Skripal affair propaganda)
- 13:11, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Andy Pryce (→Skripal affair)
- 13:07, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Andy Pryce
- 13:05, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+153) . . Andy Pryce
- 13:01, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+90) . . N File:Screenshot 2018-11-27 at 12.41.03.png (Andy Pryce, Head of Counter Disinformation and Media Development, FCO, March 2018.) (current)
- 12:57, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Andy Pryce (→Notes=)
- 12:57, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+2,989) . . N Andy Pryce (Created page with "Andy Pryce is head of 'Counter Disinformation and Media Development' at the Foreign and Commonwealth Office in London. ==Activities== ===Skripal affair=== According to...")
- 15:35, 25 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Smith Richardson Foundation (→2015) (current)
- 09:24, 14 September 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . Police Scotland (→Chief Constables)
- 09:22, 14 September 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Police Scotland
- 09:21, 14 September 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Police Scotland (→Closely monitoring fracking protest in 2017-18)
- 09:08, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+105) . . Douglas Henry Krikler (current)
- 09:07, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Jeremy Michael Isaacs (David moved page Jeremy Isaacs to Jeremy Michael Isaacs)
- 09:07, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . N Jeremy Isaacs (David moved page Jeremy Isaacs to Jeremy Michael Isaacs) (current)
- 09:06, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . Jeremy Michael Isaacs (→Affiliations)
- 07:38, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+57) . . Douglas Henry Krikler
- 07:37, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Douglas Henry Krikler (David moved page Douglas Krikler to Douglas Henry Krikler)
- 07:37, 2 August 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . N Douglas Krikler (David moved page Douglas Krikler to Douglas Henry Krikler) (current)
- 14:33, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Gerald Maurice Ronson (David moved page Gerald Ronson to Gerald Maurice Ronson)
- 14:33, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . N Gerald Ronson (David moved page Gerald Ronson to Gerald Maurice Ronson) (current)
- 10:34, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+17) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:33, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . N David Menton (David moved page David Menton to David Jeremy Menton) (current)
- 10:33, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m David Jeremy Menton (David moved page David Menton to David Jeremy Menton) (current)
- 10:31, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:30, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:30, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:29, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:28, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:22, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-47) . . Community Security Trust (→2011)
- 10:19, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+3,328) . . Community Security Trust (→People)
- 10:18, 31 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+97) . . Community Security Trust (→CST publications)
- 13:33, 28 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Association of Professional Political Consultants (→APPC Registers) (current)
- 10:48, 18 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Tom Tugendhat (current)
- 10:47, 18 July 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Tom Tugendhat
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)