User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 15:08, 13 May 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-132) . . Airey Neave Trust (→Trustees: dubious source removed)
- 21:50, 11 May 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . James Clement Dunn (typo) (current)
- 20:58, 11 May 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+390) . . N James Clement Dunn (started a page)
- 00:28, 24 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,212) . . N Preventing Extremism Unit (Department for Education) (started a page)
- 21:58, 22 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+899) . . N Anthony Pollen (started a page) (current)
- 18:04, 20 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+79) . . N File:ErandaGrants2013.pdf (Eranda Foundation: Schedule of grants paid for the year ended 5 April 2013.)
- 17:34, 16 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+171) . . Category:Old Boy Network (→External resources)
- 16:07, 15 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+81) . . Robert Hannigan (typos) (current)
- 16:06, 15 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,958) . . N Robert Hannigan (started a page)
- 15:36, 15 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Government Communications Headquarters (→Directors)
- 15:36, 15 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+194) . . Government Communications Headquarters (→Directors)
- 20:48, 13 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+190) . . Charles Farr (→External Resources)
- 16:44, 9 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+313) . . Andrea Leadsom (enters government)
- 16:41, 9 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+330) . . Nicky Morgan (promotion)
- 16:06, 9 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+253) . . Sajid Javid (culture secretary)
- 14:32, 9 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+731) . . Maria Miller (resignation)
- 00:48, 5 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+611) . . Security Service (→Binyam Mohamed case)
- 23:57, 3 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+289) . . Jack Sheehan (External resources) (current)
- 13:48, 2 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+164) . . Donald Rumsfeld (→Articles)
- 13:40, 2 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+193) . . Autonomy Systems Ltd (→Hewlett Packard takeover) (current)
- 13:32, 2 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+204) . . Mike Lynch (external resources)
- 23:41, 1 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+413) . . N Mike Lynch (started a page)
- 22:39, 1 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+245) . . Autonomy Systems Ltd (→Foundation)
- 21:48, 1 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,080) . . Autonomy Systems Ltd (clients)
- 21:05, 1 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+862) . . Autonomy Systems Ltd (Foundation/richard Perle)
- 17:28, 1 April 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,300) . . N Autonomy Systems Ltd (started a page)
- 16:54, 31 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+222) . . Ian Hurst (→External Resources) (current)
- 12:52, 29 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+417) . . James Nicholson (→Resources) (current)
- 12:27, 29 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . N Jim Nicholson (redirect James Nicholson) (current)
- 12:20, 29 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+394) . . News International-Northern Ireland timeline (→2000)
- 23:28, 19 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+256) . . Yaroslav Stetsko (external resources) (current)
- 22:18, 18 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,277) . . N Michael Barone (started a page) (current)
- 00:16, 11 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+532) . . The Charles Wolfson Charitable Trust (→Funding)
- 21:39, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,273) . . N Ian McColl (started a page)
- 21:23, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Wyndham Deedes (typo) (current)
- 20:15, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,306) . . Anglo-Israel Association (→People)
- 18:48, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Wyndham Deedes (→Late Career)
- 18:48, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+402) . . Wyndham Deedes (→Late Career)
- 18:23, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . m Wyndham Deedes (→=Late Career)
- 18:22, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+2,964) . . N Wyndham Deedes (started a page)
- 17:35, 10 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+526) . . N Anglo-Israel Association (started a page)
- 20:27, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Atlantic Bridge (→Dissolution) (current)
- 20:26, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+408) . . Atlantic Bridge (→Dissolution)
- 19:58, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m William Shawcross (→Lobbying Bill)
- 19:35, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m William Shawcross (→Executive pay campaign)
- 19:34, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+615) . . William Shawcross (→Charity Commission)
- 19:06, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+1,906) . . William Shawcross (CC controversies)
- 18:38, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+489) . . William Shawcross (→External resources)
- 18:33, 9 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (+170) . . Metropolitan Police Service (→External resources) (current)
- 17:07, 6 March 2014 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Priti Patel (→=Criticism of charities)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)