User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 14:47, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+702) . . N Robert Rosenkranz (New page: '''Robert Rosenkrantz''' (born 5 August 1942) is an American multi-millionaire financier. He is Chairman and CEO of Delphi Financial Group and founder of The Rosenkranz Foundation ...)
- 14:37, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees (as at 16 April 2010))
- 14:23, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . m George Robinson (financier) (→Donations to the Conservative Party)
- 14:23, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+3,292) . . N George Robinson (financier) (New page: '''George Edward Silvanus Robinson''' (born 29 November 1956) is a British millionaire financier and Conservative Party donor. He was appointed a Trustee of the right-wing think-tank [...)
- 13:55, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N The Sunday Telegraph (Redirecting to The Telegraph) (current)
- 13:54, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+696) . . N Virginia Fraser (New page: '''Virginia Mary Fraser''' (born 7 October 1950) is a writer for ''Homes & Gardens'' magazine and the widow of Frank Johnson, <ref>Alan Watkins, '[http://www.spectator.co.uk/books/5529...)
- 13:38, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,320) . . Richard Briance
- 13:31, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Richard Ehrman (current)
- 13:30, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+41) . . Robin Edwards (current)
- 13:29, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+900) . . N Richard Ehrman (New page: '''Richard Albert Ehrman''' (born 25 April 1956) is a journalist, 'think-tanker' and businessman. He was appointed a Trustee of right-wing think-tank Policy Exchange on 19 July 2005. A...)
- 13:26, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Richard Ehrman First Post profile.JPG (current)
- 13:16, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-7) . . m Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees (as at 16 April 2010))
- 13:15, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-24) . . Robin Edwards
- 13:14, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+792) . . N Robin Edwards (New page: '''Robin Warwick Edwards''' (born 7 November 1946) was appointed Trustee, Treasurer and Company Secretary for the right-wing think-tank Policy Exchange on 12 June 2002. An individual b...)
- 11:28, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Camilla Cavendish
- 11:28, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+198) . . N Camilla Cavendish (New page: '''Camilla Hilary Cavendish''' (born 20 Augsut 1968) is a columnist and leader writer for The Times. She was appointed a Trustee of the right-wing think-tank Policy Exchange on 12 ...)
- 11:26, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-30) . . Richard Briance
- 11:25, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+229) . . N Richard Briance (New page: '''Richard Henry Briance''' (born 23 August 1953) is a British banker who has donated substantial sums to the Conservative Party. He was appointed a Trustee of the right-wing think-tan...)
- 11:20, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+65) . . Charles Moore
- 11:02, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-17) . . m Policy Exchange (→Policy Exchange current and former trustees (as at 16 April 2010))
- 11:02, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Theodore Agnew (→Donations to the Conservative Party)
- 11:01, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Theodore Agnew (→Donations to the Conservative Party)
- 11:00, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,625) . . Theodore Agnew
- 10:44, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+182) . . N Theodore Agnew (New page: '''Theodore Thomas More Agnew''' (born 17 January 1961) is a British insurance executive. He was appointed a Trustee of the right-wing think-tank Policy Exchange on 1 April 2006.)
- 10:34, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+3,263) . . Policy Exchange (Trustees)
- 08:31, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Policy Exchange (→Address)
- 08:22, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . Policy Exchange
- 08:21, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Francis Maude (→Biography)
- 08:20, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,451) . . Francis Maude (→Biography: Policy Exchange etc)
- 08:16, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+102) . . Archie Norman (→Politics)
- 08:14, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Archie Norman (→Politics)
- 08:13, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2,368) . . Archie Norman (→Politics: Policy Exchange and CChange)
- 08:06, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . m Policy Exchange (→Origins and launch)
- 08:03, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . Archie Norman (→Education and business career)
- 08:03, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Archie Norman (→Education and business career)
- 08:00, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Archie Norman
- 07:59, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+37) . . Archie Norman
- 07:59, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+57) . . Archie Norman
- 07:57, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Archie Norman
- 07:56, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Archie Norman
- 07:55, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+428) . . Archie Norman
- 07:53, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Archie Norman (→Biography: seperate politics section)
- 07:50, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+524) . . Archie Norman (→Biography)
- 07:41, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+293) . . Archie Norman (→Biography)
- 07:29, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+493) . . Archie Norman (→Biography)
- 07:25, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+334) . . Archie Norman (→Biography)
- 07:20, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+227) . . Archie Norman (→Biography)
- 07:18, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+449) . . Archie Norman (→Education and business career)
- 07:08, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+321) . . Archie Norman (→Education and business career)
- 07:04, 16 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . Archie Norman (→Education and business career)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)