User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:39, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+299) . . Kathryn Gyngell (newswatch dissolved) (current)
- 10:38, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+299) . . David Keighley
- 10:37, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Newswatch
- 10:36, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+315) . . Newswatch
- 10:31, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-655) . . Newswatch
- 10:29, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,144) . . Newswatch
- 10:27, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+907) . . N Newswatch (New page: '''Newswatch''' (officially '''Newswatch UK Ltd''') a right-wing media monitoring company. It was incorporated on 6 September 2007 and is co-owned and directed by the right-wing activist [...)
- 10:16, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-18) . . Alan Monahan (current)
- 10:16, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+512) . . N Alan Monahan (New page: '''Alan Monahan''' is a former BBC PR man Alan Monahan, who founded the media consultancy Kirkby Monahan with Dan Kirkby. <ref>‘Media specialist quits for rival’, PR We...)
- 10:01, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Keighley Stoddart (current)
- 10:00, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+144) . . Howell James (categories added)
- 09:58, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+38) . . David Keighley
- 09:56, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Keighley Stoddart
- 09:55, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,141) . . N Keighley Stoddart (New page: '''Keighley Stoddart''' was a media consultancy co-owned by David Keighley, the former Head of Press and Publicity at TV-am and the journalist and TV critic Patrick Stoddart. I...)
- 09:41, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+20) . . m Kathryn Gyngell
- 09:40, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Kathryn Gyngell
- 09:38, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . m Kathryn Gyngell
- 08:11, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+114) . . David Keighley (categories added)
- 08:07, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . m David Keighley (→Affiliations)
- 08:06, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . David Keighley (jpeg)
- 08:05, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:David Keighley.JPG (current)
- 08:05, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . David Keighley
- 08:04, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+215) . . David Keighley
- 08:00, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4,752) . . N David Keighley (New page: '''David John Keighley''' (born 23 December 1951) is a media consultant and right-wing operative. ==Biographical information== Keighley graduated from Emmanuel College, Cambridge in 1970....)
- 07:54, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . m Minotaur Media Tracking (→Output)
- 07:50, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . Kathryn Gyngell (→Education and career)
- 16:28, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+88) . . m Economist Intelligence Unit
- 16:27, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+117) . . Economist Intelligence Unit
- 16:21, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Economist Intelligence Unit
- 16:19, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . m Economist Intelligence Unit (→History)
- 16:19, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,528) . . Economist Intelligence Unit (Started history section)
- 15:56, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Eiu 60years online.pdf (current)
- 09:07, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Dominic Whiteman (→Education and early business ventures)
- 09:06, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-429) . . Dominic Whiteman (→Education and early business ventures)
- 09:02, 13 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+333) . . Dominic Whiteman (→Education and early business ventures)
- 09:37, 12 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Samuel Brittan
- 09:37, 12 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+274) . . Samuel Brittan
- 20:53, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Peter Jay (→1979–2009)
- 20:52, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+675) . . Peter Jay (→1979–2009: Peacock testimony)
- 11:43, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+393) . . Norman Tebbit (→Biography)
- 11:18, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Norman Tebbit (→Biography)
- 11:18, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Norman Tebbit (→Biography)
- 11:18, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+718) . . Norman Tebbit (→Biography: monday club)
- 11:17, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+85) . . Conservative Monday Club (ref fmt)
- 11:11, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+290) . . Norman Tebbit (→Affiliations: Monday Club)
- 10:34, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Norman Tebbit (→Biography)
- 10:34, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Norman Tebbit (→Biography)
- 10:33, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Norman Tebbit
- 10:18, 11 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . m Norman Tebbit (→Attacks on the BBC)
- 11:15, 8 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Norman Tebbit (→Attacks on the BBC)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)