Search results
Create the page "Chairman" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- Ridley was chairman of [[Northern Rock]] from 2004 to 2007, resigning after Northern Rock exper Ridley is chairman of the [http://www.life.org.uk./ International Centre for Life], a multi-mi9 KB (1,229 words) - 16:19, 10 December 2019
- * Professor [[Nick Talbot]] (Chairman) * Dr [[Graham Birch]] (Deputy Chairman)11 KB (1,596 words) - 15:06, 31 January 2015
- *[[Chris Powell]] - Chairman *[[Jeremy Hardie]] - Treasurer - also chairman of [[Opendemocracy]], and of WH Smith7 KB (1,085 words) - 14:03, 29 August 2012
- ...boutus/ About Us]</ref> Five founders of the company - [[Neil Hedges]] and chairman [[Dale Fishburn]], together with [[Andrew Boys]], [[John Williams]] and [[C ...ising in corporate marketing and reputation, was co-founder and its former Chairman, having started his career in consumer advertising with [[J. Walter Thompso41 KB (5,204 words) - 13:23, 3 March 2017
- *[[Andrew Gairdner]], chairman40 KB (4,496 words) - 16:36, 23 December 2016
- ...worked for the National Centre for Young People with Epilepsy and has been chairman of an NHS hospital trust. She is a member of the [[Press Complaints Commiss9 KB (1,208 words) - 04:06, 9 September 2013
- *[[Steve Morgan]], Chairman and Director of Public Affairs for Morgan Allen Moore. In 2000 he was the I2 KB (330 words) - 00:31, 29 August 2010
- *[[Michael Howard]] QC MP - President and founding chairman *[[Lord Powell of Bayswater]] - Chairman8 KB (1,178 words) - 07:41, 24 February 2011
- ....membership_code_etc.Code_of_Conduct/ APPC Code of Conduct]</ref> The then chairman of the APPC, [[Gill Morris]], accepted Edelman’s apology for the “overs ...Treasury department until May 2010, peer in the House of Lords and former chairman of [[Huntsworth]], [[Guardian Media Group]] and [[Marks and Spencer]].<ref>68 KB (8,353 words) - 13:31, 3 March 2017
- ...t organised a conference on GM called Fields of the Future. The conference chairman was Lord [[Dick Taverne]] of [[Sense about Science]], and [[Tracey Brown]]30 KB (4,547 words) - 04:42, 25 July 2015
- *[[Bruce Crawford]] Chairman, Chairman of the Finance Committee ...man, Jr.]], Senior Advisor, National League, Major League Baseball, Former Chairman, Arena Co., Member of the Compensation and Governance Committees7 KB (954 words) - 10:59, 23 February 2015
- *[[Mercedes Erra]], Executive Co-Chairman, Euro RSCG Worldwide, Chairman of Euro RSCG France and President of BETC Euro RSCG *[[Stephane Fouks]], Executive Co-Chairman, Euro RSCG Worldwide, Chairman of Euro RSCG France24 KB (3,864 words) - 13:51, 3 January 2011
- ===Chairman===6 KB (837 words) - 20:48, 21 May 2012
- ...Co and honorary president of the UK-wide [[Community Foundation Network]]. Chairman of Governors of Sherborne School and Honorary Fellow of Worcester College O *Chairman of Governors of [[Sherborne School]], and2 KB (284 words) - 10:04, 29 September 2014
- *[[Hardy Bouillon]], Chairman, Academic Advisory Board *[[Hardy Bouillon]], Chairman, Academic Advisory Boar Source: Center for the New Europe website 4/0411 KB (1,559 words) - 18:48, 21 February 2016
- ...irm [[Marsh & McLennan Companies]] in July 2004. Lead on the Marsh side as chairman and CEO was [[Jeffrey W. Greenberg]], the son of [[American International G *Jules B. Kroll, Executive Chairman of the Board7 KB (1,076 words) - 14:47, 17 May 2008
- When he was made Science Minister, Lord Sainsbury resigned as Chairman of the Sainsbury's supermarket chain and put into a blind trust major inves ...million in funding since Sainsbury became Science Minister. Until 2003 its Chairman was [[Peter Doyle]] a director of biotech giant [[Sourcewatch:Syngenta|Syng40 KB (5,611 words) - 08:19, 17 January 2020
- ...rty management company specialising in plant and microbial science.' PBL's Chairman is [[Ed Dart]].2 KB (325 words) - 18:09, 2 March 2010
- ...unity: The role of Biotechnology in Agriculture]. Stott was the conference chairman. According to the conference blurb, 'Participation will be broad-based, inc10 KB (1,606 words) - 04:44, 25 July 2015
- ...ing Marxism]] network. Interestingly, in the SMC's Consultation Report the Chairman of [[Sense About Science]], Lord [[Dick Taverne]], was among those who 'arg53 KB (7,448 words) - 11:21, 25 February 2015