User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 12:42, 30 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (-247) . . Benzion Schalom Eliezer Freshwater
- 14:04, 29 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . The Shlomo Memorial Fund Limited (→Former Directors) (current)
- 14:22, 27 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . Hasmonean Multi-Academy Trust (→Former pupils) (current)
- 14:03, 27 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (-52) . . Hasmonean Multi-Academy Trust
- 14:01, 27 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . N Jerusalem Educational Trust (Redirected page to The Jerusalem Educational Trust) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 16:16, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+293) . . The Jerusalem Educational Trust
- 15:09, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Loftus Charitable Trust
- 15:07, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Loftus Charitable Trust
- 15:07, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+159) . . Loftus Charitable Trust
- 15:06, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Loftus Charitable Trust (→Grant Recipients)
- 15:05, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+39) . . Loftus Charitable Trust
- 15:04, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Loftus Charitable Trust (→Grant Recipients)
- 15:03, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . The Jerusalem Educational Trust
- 15:03, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+1,160) . . N The Jerusalem Educational Trust (Created page with "The Jerusalem Educational Trust, finances Ateret Yerushalayim, also known as Ateret Cohanim, an organisation that seeks to establish a Jewish majority in occupied...")
- 15:02, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+52) . . Ateret Cohanim (current)
- 14:52, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+267) . . Broom Foundation
- 14:48, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . Ohr Torah Ltd (→Resources)
- 14:47, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Neorim (current)
- 14:42, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+110) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Norim School
- 14:42, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Norim School
- 14:41, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Norim School
- 14:41, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Norim School
- 14:40, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+68) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Norim School
- 10:14, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+778) . . The Bersam Trust
- 10:00, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+73) . . The Bersam Trust (→Resources)
- 09:57, 25 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Talmud Torah Chinuch Norim School (→Proprietor)
- 14:02, 24 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . N Bersam Trust (Redirected page to The Bersam Trust) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 14:01, 24 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N OHR Torah Ltd (Redirected page to Ohr Torah Ltd) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 14:00, 24 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Broom Foundation (→Trustees)
- 14:00, 24 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Reisner Charitable Foundation (Changed redirect target from The Resiner Charitable Foundation Ltd to The Reisner Charitable Foundation Ltd) (current) (Tag: Redirect target changed)
- 14:00, 24 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . N Reisner Charitable Foundation (Redirected page to The Resiner Charitable Foundation Ltd) (Tag: New redirect)
- 13:59, 24 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+4,712) . . The Reisner Charitable Foundation Ltd (current)
- 15:17, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . RNH Synagogue & College Ltd (→Contact) (current)
- 14:46, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (-152) . . Chassidei Belz Manchester (→Related parties) (current)
- 14:44, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+2,017) . . N Joshua Waldman (Created page with " {| class="wikitable" ! Name !! Company status !! Correspondence address !! Role !! Date of birth !! Appointed on !! Resigned on !! Nationality !! Country of residence !! Oc...") (current)
- 14:34, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+1,933) . . Bais Malka Ltd (current)
- 12:41, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . N Sympathetic Trust (Redirected page to The Sympathetic Trust) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 12:40, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . The Sanz Foundation (→Trustees) (current)
- 12:40, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m The Sanz Foundation (David moved page Sanz Foundation to The Sanz Foundation)
- 12:40, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . N Sanz Foundation (David moved page Sanz Foundation to The Sanz Foundation) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 12:39, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Belz Communities (→People) (current)
- 12:39, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Chassidei Belz Manchester (→Related parties)
- 12:39, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+101) . . Chassidei Belz Manchester (→Related parties)
- 12:38, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+51) . . Chassidei Belz Manchester (→Related parties)
- 12:36, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+700) . . N Belz Communities (Created page with " ==People== {| class="wikitable" ! Name !! Role !! Date of appointment !! Other trusteeships |- | Itzchak Grosz || Trustee || 23 May 2021 || None on record |- | David N...")
- 11:49, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+369) . . N Beis Malka Girls School (Salford) (Created page with "Beis Malka Girls School (Salford) is run by Bais Malka Ltd, a company which is associated with the Belz (Hasidic dynasty). URN: 136117, Address: 399-401 Bury New...") (current)
- 11:48, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+266) . . N Bais Malka Ltd (Created page with "Bais Malka Ltd is a company which runs Beis Malka Girls School (Salford). It is associated with the Belz (Hasidic dynasty). In 2020 and 2021 it gave interest free loa...")
- 11:43, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Chassidei Belz Manchester (→People)
- 11:43, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Talmud Torah Tashbar London Limited (→Directors) (current)
- 11:42, 23 November 2023 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Talmud Torah Tashbar London Limited
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)