All public logs
Combined display of all available logs of Powerbase. You can narrow down the view by selecting a log type, the username (case-sensitive), or the affected page (also case-sensitive).
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)- 08:32, 7 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Committee of Professional Agricultural Organisations in the EU General Confederation of Agricultural Cooperatives in the EU to Committee of Professional Agricultural Organisations in the EU - General Confederation of Agricultural Cooperatives in the EU
- 00:04, 4 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Israel Defence Forces to Israel Defense Forces
- 14:30, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page FodDrinkEurope (content was: "#REDIRECT FoodDrinkEurope" (and the only contributor was "David"))
- 14:15, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page FodDrinkEurope to FoodDrinkEurope
- 14:15, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page FoodDrinkEurope (Deleted to make way for move)
- 14:15, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Confederation of Food and Drink Industries of the EEC to FoodDrinkEurope
- 14:14, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Confederation of Food and Drink Industries of the EEC to FodDrinkEurope
- 14:14, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Confederation des Industries Agro-Alimentaires to Confederation of Food and Drink Industries of the EEC
- 14:09, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Eesti Toiduainetööstuse Liit to Association of Estonian Food Industry
- 12:57, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Estonian Advertising Assoc logo.gif (Logo of the Estonian Association of Advertising Agencies, circa 2006. Source: [http://web.archive.org/web/20060117085943/http://www.eral.ee/index_eng.html ERAL - English], Retrieved from the Internet Archive of 17 January 2006, accessed 3 August 2012)
- 12:41, 3 August 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Eesti Reklaamiagentuuride to Estonian Association of Advertising Agencies
- 14:30, 27 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:SCL-Nigel Oakes-6 October 2008.jpg (Screengrab of the website after the removal of the claim that Nigel Oakes was educated at University College London. Created from <http://web.archive.org/web/20081006063255/http://www.scl.cc/staffmember.php?staffid=1§ion=6> Retrieved from the)
- 14:27, 27 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:SCL-Nigel Oakes-23 August 2007.jpg (Screengrab of the claim that Nigel Oakes was educated at University College London. Created from <http://web.archive.org/web/20070823010443/http://www.scl.cc/staffmember.php?staffid=1§ion=6> Retrieved from the Internet Archive of 23 August 20)
- 14:15, 27 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:SCL-Nigel Oakes-2009 -Internet Archive-6 april 2009.jpeg (Strategic Communication Laboratories, [http://web.archive.org/web/20090406013503/http://www.scl.cc/article.php?id=34 Overview], Retrieved from the Internet Archive of 6 April 2009, accessed 27 June 2012)
- 14:06, 27 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Www.creativebrief.com support uploads 1203605596-1 working with us.swf-134645.jpg (Krow Communications, [http://www.creativebrief.com/support/uploads/1203605596-1_working_with_us.swf About Behaviour], created from <http://www.creativebrief.com/support/uploads/1203605596-1_working_with_us.swf> on 27 June 2012.)
- 12:59, 27 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:BDI-History-27 June 2012.jpg (The Behavioural Behavioural Dynamics Institute website once the claim about the link with the University of London had been removed. Screengrab of <http://www.bdinstitute.org/about-us/history/> accessed 27 June 2012.)
- 12:54, 27 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:BDI-History-19 November 2008.jpg (The claim that the Behavioural Dynamics Working Group - the progenitor of the Behavioural Dynamics institute - was set up at the University of London. Screengrab of <http://web.archive.org/web/20081119122932/http://www.bdinstitute.org/02_histo)
- 20:15, 25 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page The Damage Was Done to The Damage Was Done: The Gibraltar Inquest
- 09:00, 21 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Higher Education in the USA (content was: "Higher education institutions in the United States of America. Category:Higher Education" (and the only contributor was "David"))
- 23:55, 9 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Douglas Davis photo.jpg (Douglas Davis, journalist and critic of the BBC)
- 23:53, 9 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Davis book on Israel.jpg (''Israel Today for the World of Tomorrow Israel in the World: Changing Lives Through Innovation'' Helen Davis and Douglas Davis Weidenfeld & Nicolson, 2005, Wit a foreword from Rupert Murdoch.)
- 13:34, 9 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Roucaute-Neoconservatisme.jpg (Yves Roucaute's 2005 book ''Neoconservatisme is a Humanism''.)
- 21:06, 8 June 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Valerie Hoffenberg to Valérie Hoffenberg
- 07:58, 25 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Discourse Coalition to Discourse coalition
- 07:58, 25 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Invisible College to Invisible college
- 07:57, 25 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Epistemic Community to Epistemic community
- 07:57, 25 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Thought Collective to Thought collective
- 12:00, 22 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Democracy & Security International Conference to Democracy and Security International Conference over redirect
- 20:05, 14 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Wise Men to Wise Men (US dining club)
- 19:38, 14 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Movement Conservatism to Movement conservatism
- 09:25, 12 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:REVOLUTIONARY COMMUNIST PARTY PAPERS No 8 SEPTEMBER 198... 1336814981614.png (RCP Revolutionary Communist Papers No. 8 'Prolonging the Death Agony', September 1981.)
- 15:48, 7 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:CEPOS:Analyses published by CEPOS (content before blanking was: "Recent analyses published by CEPOS: * Saturday, November 14th 2009, "Bully-package" raises questions in relation to the European Convention on Human Rights * Monday, November 9th 2009, Budgetary discipline in the municip...")
- 13:24, 2 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Corporations (content was: "#REDIRECT Corporations - Web of Influence" (and the only contributor was "Claire Harkins"))
- 08:21, 1 May 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Ladbrokes to Ladbrokes PLC
- 16:50, 28 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page The Copenhagen Institute to Copenhagen Institute
- 09:35, 28 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:CEPOS:Founders (content was: "* Christopher Arzrouni, Special advisor * Rolf Bagger, Author * Annelise Bidstrup, Editor * Sven Blomberg, Chief Executive Officer * Bent Blüdnikow, E..." (and the only contributor was "Peter Metrak"))
- 09:29, 28 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page CEPOS to Centre for Political Studies
- 09:25, 28 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:CEPOS to CEPOS
- 22:31, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:CEPOS:Centre Council (content was: "* Christopher Arzrouni, Special advisor. * Helle Bechgaard, Managing Director, Ph.D., graduate in Pharmacology. * Jens Bigum, Chairman of the Board of A..." (and the only contributor was "Peter Metrak"))
- 22:27, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:CEPOS:Advisory Board (content was: "* Robert C. Waggoner, Professor of Economics, Harvard University (USA) * Carl Bildt, Minister of Foreign Affairs, former Prime Minister, MP and EU & UN ..." (and the only contributor was "Peter Metrak"))
- 21:28, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:CEPOS:Jacob Mchangama (content was: "#REDIRECT Jacob Mchangama" (and the only contributor was "David"))
- 21:14, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:CEPOS:Jacob Mchangama to Jacob Mchangama
- 21:10, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:CEPOS:Henrik Gade Jensen to Henrik Gade Jensen
- 21:08, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Globalisation:CEPOS:Mads Lundby Hansen to Mads Lundby Hansen
- 21:06, 27 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Globalisation:CEPOS:Henrik Christofferson (content was: "Henrik Christofferson, from the year 2008 is Research Director at CEPOS. Between 1983 and 2008 Henrik Christofferson was a Heas of Research in Applied M..." (and the only contributor was "Peter Metrak"))
- 13:59, 26 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Www.nci-forum.co.uk screen capture 2012-4-26-15-6-38.png (Graphic of members of the National Casino Industry Forum. Screengrab from the [http://www.nci-forum.co.uk/industry.html NCIF website], taken 26 April 2012.)
- 22:38, 25 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Church Society FamilyTree.jpg (The Church Society Family Tree, showing the various Protestant organisations that led to the formation of the society in 1950. Source: The Church Society, accessed 25 April 2012.)
- 15:05, 24 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) deleted page Category:All Party Parliamentary Group (content was: "'''All-party parliamentary groups''' within the British parliament are regarded as relatively informal groups compared with, for example, select committees of the House. The membership of all-party groups is mainly comprised of backbench...")
- 10:51, 24 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) moved page Associate Parliamentary Food and Health Forum to Associate Parliamentary Food and Health Group
- 08:23, 22 April 2012 David (talk | contribs) uploaded File:Paperspast.natlib.govt.nz screen capture 2012-4-21-10-49-29.png (Press Association 'Protestant Truth Society Protest - "No Popery" Demonstration', ''Colonist'', Volume LII, Issue 12858, 30 July 1910, Page 2. Retrieved from [http://paperspast.natlib.govt.nz/cgi-bin/paperspast?a=d&d=TC19100730.2.27 Papers Past], National)