Search results
Create the page "1976" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- ...include Hambros Bank Limited, 1973-96; [[Shepperton Studios]] (chairman), 1976-79; [[National Bus Company Ltd]], 1984-91; Department of Applied Economics,9 KB (1,259 words) - 09:04, 17 July 2015
- * Sir [[Campbell Adamson]] (October 15, 1969 - July 2, 1976) * Sir [[John Methven]] (July 2, 1976 - April 23, 1980) (died in office)9 KB (1,236 words) - 11:38, 3 February 2015
- ...l</i> newspaper and was the publisher of The [[Murray County Herald]] from 1976-1978. He has featured in numerous national publications, including The <i>[7 KB (1,023 words) - 16:41, 31 March 2009
- #{{note|Ket}} [http://www.ketupa.net/timeline6.htm Ketupa.net Media Timeline 1976-1990]1 KB (198 words) - 17:40, 2 July 2007
- *[[Peter Bazalgette]] (1976) - Chairman of Endemol UK, the makers of 'Big Brother'5 KB (762 words) - 06:38, 21 September 2008
- Prashar was a director of the [[Runnymede Trust]] from 1976 to 1984, a fellow with the Policy Studies Institute from 1984 to 1986, and2 KB (355 words) - 09:55, 3 November 2009
- *1976 to 1984: AI-USA establishing the organization's Program to Abolish the Deat1 KB (159 words) - 11:36, 18 June 2007
- ...or Tuzo to become Deputy Supreme Commander in Europe to General Al Haig in 1976.<ref>Max Arthur '[http://www.findarticles.com/p/articles/mi_qn4158/is_199807 KB (1,033 words) - 10:44, 15 December 2015
- ...became one of [[David Rockefeller]]'s [[Trilateral Commission]] members in 1976 and has chaired the European working group of the right-wing [[Centre for S2 KB (245 words) - 08:38, 12 November 2007
- *[[Jan Nowak-Jeziorański]] - head of the Polish section 1952-19765 KB (806 words) - 18:31, 10 March 2015
- ...onal convention alternate delegate for [[Ronald Reagan]] in [[1968]] and [[1976]], and a Ronald Reagan delegate at the [[1980 Republican National Conventio5 KB (688 words) - 22:17, 20 November 2006
- ...is a pseudonym used by [[Reuven Erlich]] in writing about Syria in between 1976 and 1991. At the time Erlich was a serving Israeli intelligence officer. A ...Crisis in Lebanon- Motives, Characteristics and Aims" Ma'arachot (October, 1976). (Hebrew)3 KB (450 words) - 22:04, 24 December 2009
- *Degree and master's degree in arts (1976).3 KB (440 words) - 14:44, 15 September 2010
- ...ctor since April 1996. Mr. Walkush has held various positions with us from 1976 to 1979 and since 1981, including serving as a Sector Vice President from 112 KB (1,717 words) - 20:31, 28 October 2007
- ...a conservative daily opposing Arab nationalism. It ceased publication in 1976 due to the assassination of its founder and the Lebanese civil war. Oifi re8 KB (1,271 words) - 02:35, 23 September 2016
- ...ncluding ''The Gaitskellites'' (1969), ''The Death of British Democracy'' (1976), ''The Tragedy of Labor'' (1981), ''Thatcher and the New Radicalism'' (19814 KB (2,048 words) - 11:32, 20 August 2010
- ...re tax haven. Because he was born in India (he became a British citizen in 1976) Lord Paul was until 2010'non-domiciled' for tax purposes, which allowed hi6 KB (915 words) - 10:49, 16 February 2015
- ...an her career with [[The Economist]] in 1967, becoming economics editor in 1976. During the 1980s her responsibility for economics coverage continued at Th3 KB (450 words) - 14:07, 27 January 2017
- ...rom 1926 to 1945 and acted as a Publicity Adviser to the League from until 1976. Mike Hughes writes:14 KB (2,226 words) - 06:59, 22 July 2010
- :1976-77 FCO, Japan Desk2 KB (287 words) - 15:52, 3 December 2014