User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 16:03, 15 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m William Rees-Mogg
- 16:02, 15 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+224) . . William Rees-Mogg (Garrick Club membership)
- 17:23, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Mission to explain
- 17:21, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+578) . . Mission to explain
- 17:14, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2,120) . . Mission to explain
- 16:17, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-7) . . Mission to explain
- 16:17, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Mission to explain
- 16:16, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+597) . . N Mission to explain (New page: The ''''Mission to Explain'''' is a philosophy of broadcasting journalist developed by John Birt and Peter Jay in the 1970s. The concept developed from a series of articles appeari...)
- 15:35, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-39) . . BBC: Centre for Policy Studies
- 15:30, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-33) . . BBC: Social Affairs Unit
- 15:27, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . BBC: Social Affairs Unit (→Social Affairs Unit and the BBC)
- 15:24, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . Social Affairs Unit (→Resources)
- 15:21, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . m BBC: Social Affairs Unit (→Social Affairs Unit in brief)
- 15:21, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+356) . . BBC: Social Affairs Unit (Social Affairs Unit in brief section)
- 15:16, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+150) . . BBC: Social Affairs Unit (jpeg + fmt)
- 15:14, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Social Affairs Unit - Scrap the BBC.jpg (current)
- 15:14, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+17) . . BBC: Social Affairs Unit
- 15:12, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . BBC: Social Affairs Unit
- 15:12, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Richarddnorth long CV.pdf (current)
- 15:12, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,055) . . N BBC: Social Affairs Unit (New page: <CENTER>'''This page relates to the Social Affairs Unit’s attacks on the BBC.''' '''A separate page deals with the Social Affairs Unit in general.''' </CENTE...)
- 14:48, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+39) . . BBC: Centre for Policy Studies
- 14:40, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Digby Anderson
- 14:39, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,842) . . N Digby Anderson (New page: '''Digby Carter Anderson''' (born 25 May 1944) is a right-wing Christian conservative who directed of the right-wing think-tank, the Social Affairs Unit, from 1980 to 2004. ==Biograph...)
- 13:11, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-63) . . BBC: Centre for Policy Studies (→The Thatcher Years)
- 13:08, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m BBC: Institute of Economic Affairs (→David Graham and Thatcher's Policy Unit)
- 13:08, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,012) . . BBC: Centre for Policy Studies (brian griffiths)
- 13:06, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-9) . . m Brian Griffiths (→Education and career)
- 12:42, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,553) . . Newswatch
- 12:34, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+430) . . Barclay Thompson (quote)
- 12:28, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Newswatch
- 12:28, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,266) . . N Barclay Thompson (New page: '''Gerald Barclay Thompson''' (born 15 February 1951) is a British businessman who founded the holographic products manufacturers AH Prismatic in the 1980s. <ref>LinkIn, [http://uk.linkedi...)
- 12:19, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Barclay Thompson Newswatch Screengrab.JPG (current)
- 11:42, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Bruce Gyngell
- 11:41, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-54) . . Bruce Gyngell
- 11:41, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+807) . . Bruce Gyngell (Thatcher and Griffiths)
- 11:40, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-41) . . TV-am
- 11:39, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+848) . . TV-am
- 11:25, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Bruce Gyngell (typo)
- 11:25, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . m TV-am
- 11:23, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . TV-am
- 11:22, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2,042) . . TV-am (industrial dispute)
- 11:21, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . m Bruce Gyngell
- 11:20, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . Bruce Gyngell
- 11:19, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2,485) . . N Bruce Gyngell (New page: '''Bruce Gyngell''' was a right-wing Australian media executive who is best known in the UK for having headed the ITV breakfast franchise TV-am in the mid to late 1980s. Gyngell was ...)
- 10:57, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+227) . . Andrew Jubb (current)
- 10:51, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andrew Jubb.jpg (current)
- 10:50, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+782) . . N Andrew Jubb (New page: '''Andrew Jubb''', a media and politics graduate from Sussex University, was Research Director at the right-wing media monitoring group Newswatch and its predecessor [[Minotaur Media T...)
- 10:44, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Andrew Jubb Newswatch Screengrab.JPG (current)
- 10:43, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Newswatch
- 10:42, 14 January 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . David Keighley (sp)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)