Search results
Create the page "1976" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- ...onal convention alternate delegate for [[Ronald Reagan]] in [[1968]] and [[1976]], and a Ronald Reagan delegate at the [[1980 Republican National Conventio5 KB (688 words) - 22:17, 20 November 2006
- ...is a pseudonym used by [[Reuven Erlich]] in writing about Syria in between 1976 and 1991. At the time Erlich was a serving Israeli intelligence officer. A ...Crisis in Lebanon- Motives, Characteristics and Aims" Ma'arachot (October, 1976). (Hebrew)3 KB (450 words) - 22:04, 24 December 2009
- *Degree and master's degree in arts (1976).3 KB (440 words) - 14:44, 15 September 2010
- ...ctor since April 1996. Mr. Walkush has held various positions with us from 1976 to 1979 and since 1981, including serving as a Sector Vice President from 112 KB (1,717 words) - 20:31, 28 October 2007
- ...a conservative daily opposing Arab nationalism. It ceased publication in 1976 due to the assassination of its founder and the Lebanese civil war. Oifi re8 KB (1,271 words) - 02:35, 23 September 2016
- ...ncluding ''The Gaitskellites'' (1969), ''The Death of British Democracy'' (1976), ''The Tragedy of Labor'' (1981), ''Thatcher and the New Radicalism'' (19814 KB (2,048 words) - 11:32, 20 August 2010
- ...re tax haven. Because he was born in India (he became a British citizen in 1976) Lord Paul was until 2010'non-domiciled' for tax purposes, which allowed hi6 KB (915 words) - 10:49, 16 February 2015
- ...an her career with [[The Economist]] in 1967, becoming economics editor in 1976. During the 1980s her responsibility for economics coverage continued at Th3 KB (450 words) - 14:07, 27 January 2017
- ...rom 1926 to 1945 and acted as a Publicity Adviser to the League from until 1976. Mike Hughes writes:14 KB (2,226 words) - 06:59, 22 July 2010
- :1976-77 FCO, Japan Desk2 KB (287 words) - 15:52, 3 December 2014
- *1976-79 FCO3 KB (509 words) - 22:17, 11 December 2013
- ...Impact of Right-wing Politics in England 1903-32", University of Illinois, 1976. Quoted in Lobster #11 and referred to by Webber.35 KB (5,533 words) - 20:46, 1 February 2008
- *[[John Coyle]] - worked together at Broad Street PR from 1976 until 19886 KB (799 words) - 12:10, 22 February 2012
- ...es with [[Brian Basham]], founder of the PR firm [[Broad Street Group]] in 1976 and worked with him until 1988. According to ''PR Week'':2 KB (300 words) - 12:11, 22 February 2012
- James Hughes-Hallett joined the Swire Group in 1976. He has held various management positions in the Group's operations in Asia2 KB (328 words) - 23:13, 25 January 2007
- ...chell Fromstein]], who had been appointed president and CEO of Manpower in 1976. Stevenson reinstated Fromstein and he remained in these positions until hi11 KB (1,584 words) - 12:28, 2 November 2008
- John joined Arthur Andersen in 1976 and became Head of their world-wide Financial Services Industry practice in1 KB (161 words) - 19:37, 16 June 2007
- ...cess, in 1972, and early computer-linked cash dispensers, Servicetills, in 1976. Deregulation in the 1980s, culminating in 'Big Bang' in 1986, also encoura5 KB (645 words) - 08:27, 8 April 2008
- 1976 - 19792 KB (268 words) - 17:16, 14 September 2007
- *1975-1976 military service in the Netherlands.3 KB (367 words) - 11:47, 5 December 2010