Search results
Create the page "Board" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- ...ub-pbmap Sarah Jenkins, Director, Public Affairs (EMEA) at CPP Investment Board], ''LinkedIn'' profile, undated, acc 10 October 2014 </ref> ...iation of Licensed Multiple Retailers]] | [[Canada Pension Plan Investment Board]] | [[Candu Energy]] | [[Danone Nutricia]] | [[Omidyar Network]] | [[Philli37 KB (4,497 words) - 00:10, 9 November 2018
- *[[Financial Relations Board]] T: 44 20 7067 07451 KB (159 words) - 17:07, 17 December 2014
- ...ll, he was rewarded with the chairmanship of the [[Army Education Advisory Board]], a post which he said, "involved doing virtually nothing but looked good14 KB (2,040 words) - 22:22, 11 April 2013
- *Member, advisory board, [[Orca Exploration Group]] Inc (explores for and produces natural gas)<ref2 KB (334 words) - 09:23, 19 September 2022
- ...bell]] and Labour MP [[Ann Taylor]] - were required to stand down from the board to comply with APPC rules.<ref>Juliette Garside, "[http://www.prweek.com/uk28 KB (3,857 words) - 13:33, 28 July 2018
- == Board of Directors (2005)== American Education and Health Foundation – Founder and Board Chair</td>7 KB (1,020 words) - 19:04, 23 May 2007
- ...the Foundation, had said that if I were appointed he would resign from the Board, and would see that his firm - and others - withdrew their sponsorship. ...College's appeal, and continued: 'You will readily understand our Board's reluctance to support an establishment where the Professor of Nutriti54 KB (9,227 words) - 10:50, 27 April 2013
- *[[Charles St George]], Group Board Director. An ex-Tory councillor.78 KB (9,456 words) - 05:35, 13 July 2018
- ...a]] - two of Finsbury's most productive supporters - are on BNE's advisory board. [[Martin Sorrell]], head of owners [[WPP]] also sits on the BNE advisory g ...Secretary at the Treasury was present.<ref>LIST OF HOSPITALITY RECEIVED BY BOARD MEMBERS OF GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS, 1 JANUARY – 31 DECEMBER 2007, released32 KB (4,083 words) - 15:32, 10 December 2019
- ==Board of Incepta==507 bytes (55 words) - 11:01, 6 April 2008
- ...eading investment bank and non-bank financial services group. He is also a board member of [[ALJ]], Saudi Arabia's largest non-government industrial group.1 KB (186 words) - 22:37, 23 February 2007
- ...of the [[Council on Foreign Relations]] and of the International Advisory Board of [[BABi]], the successor of the [[British American Chamber of Commerce]].774 bytes (117 words) - 16:32, 23 April 2012
- *[[Almond Board of California]] *[[California Dried Plum Board]]17 KB (2,257 words) - 15:22, 5 May 2016
- '''Linda Johnson Rice''' is on the board of [[Omnicom]] the communications conglomerate and President and Chief Exec713 bytes (96 words) - 10:26, 4 August 2007
- ...[http://www.omnicomgroup.com/Governance/BoardofDirectors 'Omnicom Group - Board of Directors'], Accessed 23 July 2007.488 bytes (64 words) - 10:29, 4 August 2007
- ...Group 2007 [http://www.omnicomgroup.com/aboutomnicomgroup/boardofdirectors Board of Directors]640 bytes (85 words) - 16:00, 14 August 2007
- ...Aikman Corp.]] and [[Time Warner, Inc.]] Mr. Clark is also a member of the Board of Trustees of [[Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association]] (TIAA). <ref>797 bytes (114 words) - 13:14, 5 October 2007
- ...ted a member of the Committee for the [[Special Olympics]], serving on the Board. [http://www.lauderalumni.com/sirSorrell.php][http://www.english-speakingun7 KB (1,072 words) - 21:56, 26 April 2012
- == Board of Directors ==5 KB (760 words) - 12:24, 21 January 2020
- '''Jill M. Considine''' is on the board of [[Interpublic]]. She has been Chairman and Chief Executive Officer of T ...l Reserve Bank of New York [http://www.newyorkfed.org/aboutthefed/orgchart/board/considine.html 'Staff - Jill M. Considine'], Accessed 25th July 2007.899 bytes (122 words) - 12:22, 25 July 2007