Search results
Create the page "1976" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- ...ty; Republican Platform Committee Senior Policy Adviser in 1984, 1980, and 1976; Former Member, Advisory Council on National Security and International Aff *[[Committee on the Present Danger]] (1976 version)4 KB (619 words) - 22:21, 17 November 2011
- ...18 taking part in Old Sarum. According to British Government figures up to 1976, 262 civilians and 1858 Army officers had taken these courses.<ref>Armen Vi ...iously underestimated Government figures are to be believed, up to October 1976, 262 civilians and 1,858 Army officers had been through the course."10 KB (1,552 words) - 09:35, 15 June 2010
- ...ht-wing propaganda outfit the [[Institute for the Study of Conflict]] from 1976 until 1985. ...who became Vice-Chairman of the [[Institute for the Study of Conflict]] in 1976. <ref>Louis Le Bailly, ‘Socialists subvert traditional safeguards’, Wes9 KB (1,369 words) - 09:59, 15 October 2008
- ...of Complementary Studies, and became Professor of International Studies in 1976.<ref>[http://www.timesonline.co.uk/tol/comment/obituaries/article4105764.ec10 KB (1,369 words) - 14:44, 24 April 2009
- ...in 1983. He was also head of the History Department at SSEES from 1961 to 1976. Seton-Watson's interests extended beyond Russian history to also cover Eas1 KB (174 words) - 13:13, 15 January 2009
- ...h Michael Glenny), a symposium about the state of the planet, and Detente (1976), a series of discussions about East-West relations with experts such as Le ...Self-Containment: A conversation with George Kennan," Encounter (September 1976), p. 17.5 KB (729 words) - 15:59, 18 October 2008
- Galen has been Chairman of [[Loblaw Companies Limited]] since 1976 and is the Chairman of [[Selfridges Co Limited].2 KB (247 words) - 17:55, 23 April 2012
- ...List of 1992. Hugh has extensive operational experience including Cod War 1976,Belize 1978, Bermuda 1979,Falklands 1982,siege of the Libyan People's Burea6 KB (825 words) - 17:48, 27 October 2007
- Street joined the Home Office in 1974, taking "a career break" between 1976-82 to work with the [[British Council]] in Bogota, Colombia. Returning to t26 KB (3,886 words) - 23:53, 30 October 2008
- ...Mann KCVO was the Dean of Windsor and Chairman of St. George's House from 1976-89. during this time he was Domestic Chaplain to the Queen. He was educat5 KB (745 words) - 17:58, 23 April 2012
- ...U.S. Department of Treasury from 2006 to 2008. He joined Goldman Sachs in 1976, became a partner in 1988, worked at the Equities division from 1998 to 20025 KB (3,389 words) - 15:21, 21 July 2016
- ...trol System (AWACS); i.e. the Smith Report. He retired from the faculty in 1976 in order to pursue a career in managerial consulting and entrepreneurial ve45 KB (6,737 words) - 23:40, 21 October 2014
- *Design officer for chemical plants (1976).10 KB (1,269 words) - 10:59, 2 April 2012
- ...ention, it has to point out that despite clear warnings dating back to the 1976 when (obesity levels 6% in men and 7% in women) successive governments have26 KB (3,677 words) - 10:47, 8 April 2015
- ...for which Britain was censured by the European Human Rights Commission in 1976; murder, faked to look like ‘sectarian’ killings; the planting of bombs ...e 45598, page 1289.</ref> He was appointed a full Major General on 5 April 1976, with seniority from 2 June 1974.<ref>[http://www.london-gazette.co.uk/issu16 KB (2,214 words) - 21:43, 3 September 2013
- ...egan a case officers training course at the Shin Bet School for Arabic. In 1976, he was stationed as a case officer in the northern Gaza Strip and later se7 KB (1,084 words) - 20:59, 10 May 2013
- * 1976-91: Scientist at Institute for Plant Biochemistry and at the Central Instit18 KB (2,637 words) - 13:09, 6 March 2013
- ...hed the Democratic right into a counter-attack, which grew into the CPD in 1976 in an alliance with the right-wing think tanks. Others mentioned are more r ...f George Kennan's formulation). NSIC opened an office in Washington DC (in 1976 to be closer to the White House and the Pentagon. In setting up the office,50 KB (7,394 words) - 19:46, 20 October 2015
- *Degree in psychology and education science (1976).9 KB (1,205 words) - 09:40, 3 December 2010
- ...Unit]] since 1986. He was a Labour councillor in Newcastle upon Tyne from 1976 until 1981, and from 1981 to 1983 was a Research Fellow at the Australian N3 KB (353 words) - 18:53, 28 August 2010