User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 21:23, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Major Weiser (Redirected page to Samuel Weiser) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 21:21, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 21:21, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 21:10, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+476) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 20:55, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Jewish Continuity (→contact)
- 20:55, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Jewish Continuity
- 20:52, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . JNF Charitable Trust
- 15:24, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (-487) . . American League for a Free Palestine
- 15:22, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . American League for a Free Palestine
- 15:21, 29 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1,079) . . N American League for a Free Palestine (Created page with "American League for a Free Palestine (ALFP) was created in July 1944, by Peter H Bergson (formerly Hillel Kook), for the purpose of supporting and funding his Hebr...")
- 14:52, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+495) . . N Irgun Zevai Leumi (Created page with "Irgun Zevai Leumi (full name Hā-ʾIrgun Ha-Tzvaʾī Ha-Leūmī b-Ērētz Yiśrāʾel) also known as Etzel or most commonly as Irgun. ==People== ==Front groups== *Ame...")
- 12:53, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . Samuel Weiser (→Affiliations)
- 12:53, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+48) . . Samuel Weiser (→Affiliations)
- 12:45, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . Samuel Weiser (→Affiliations)
- 12:43, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . Samuel Weiser
- 12:41, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+231) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 12:32, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Samuel Weiser (→Affiliations)
- 12:30, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+295) . . Samuel Weiser (→Affiliations)
- 12:28, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+128) . . N Samuel Weiser (Created page with " ==Affiliations== https://www.jta.org/archive/major-weiser-of-hebrew-legion-registers-with-justice-department-as-foreign-agent")
- 09:23, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 09:22, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . 43 Group (→People)
- 09:17, 28 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+665) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 19:01, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . 43 Group (→G-L)
- 16:35, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 16:35, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1,457) . . 43 Group (→Recruitment for ethnic cleansing)
- 16:24, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+2,631) . . 43 Group
- 10:54, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Gerald Maurice Ronson
- 10:42, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+94) . . JNF UK (→Charities)
- 10:39, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . JNF UK (→Charities)
- 10:39, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . JNF UK (→Charities)
- 10:32, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . JNF Charitable Trust
- 10:32, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+184) . . JNF Charitable Trust (Removed redirect to JNF UK) (Tag: Removed redirect)
- 10:30, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+116) . . JNF UK (→Companies and groups that are linked to JNF UK)
- 10:26, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . JNF UK
- 10:22, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+41) . . Community Security Trust (→See Also)
- 10:20, 27 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+141) . . Community Security Trust (→See Also)
- 18:01, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . N Ch. Hausmann & Co. (Redirected page to CH. Hausmann & Co.) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 18:00, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Keren Kayemeth Leisrael Limited
- 17:43, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . 305 Ballards Lane (→Companies) (current)
- 17:43, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . 305 Ballards Lane
- 11:26, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Scopus Jewish Educational Trust (David moved page Scopus Jewish Education Trust to Scopus Jewish Educational Trust)
- 11:26, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . N Scopus Jewish Education Trust (David moved page Scopus Jewish Education Trust to Scopus Jewish Educational Trust) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 11:26, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+101) . . 305 Ballards Lane (→Charities)
- 11:24, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . 305 Ballards Lane
- 10:36, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Jewish Continuity (→Background)
- 10:35, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Shalom Foundation of the Zionist Federation of Great Britain and Ireland
- 10:34, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . UJ Events Plus Ltd (→Background)
- 10:34, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . UJ Events Plus Ltd (→Background)
- 10:06, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . 305 Ballards Lane
- 10:05, 26 November 2021 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . 305 Ballards Lane
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)