User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 12:40, 23 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,964) . . N Jim Hoagland (Basic profile created)
- 13:29, 11 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+338) . . Patricia Rawlings (→Career) (current)
- 13:19, 11 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . m Patricia Rawlings
- 13:18, 11 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+588) . . Patricia Rawlings (Parliamentary Career)
- 13:11, 11 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+143) . . Patricia Rawlings (→Affiliations)
- 13:10, 11 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+547) . . N Patricia Rawlings (Basic profile created)
- 12:22, 11 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+6,457) . . Hella Pick (Guardian articles added)
- 12:56, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+234) . . Hella Pick (→Publications)
- 12:53, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+344) . . Hella Pick (→Career)
- 12:52, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+99) . . Hella Pick (→Affiliations)
- 12:50, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . m Hella Pick
- 12:49, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+463) . . Hella Pick (→Affiliations)
- 12:36, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+176) . . August Hanning (→Affiliations) (current)
- 12:35, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+14,377) . . Club of Three (Steering Group added)
- 12:11, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+526) . . N Hella Pick (Basic page started)
- 11:46, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2,049) . . N August Hanning (Basic profile created)
- 11:20, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m André Hoffmann (→Philanthropic Foundations and Charities) (current)
- 11:19, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m André Hoffmann (→Philanthropic Foundations and Charities)
- 11:19, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . m André Hoffmann (→Philanthropic Foundations and Charities)
- 11:18, 10 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2,974) . . N André Hoffmann (profile created)
- 14:56, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2,340) . . Farah Pandith (more publications added)
- 13:00, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,350) . . Farah Pandith (→Publications)
- 12:37, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+218) . . m Farah Pandith (book added)
- 12:30, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Farah Pandith
- 12:29, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-123) . . m Farah Pandith (→Career)
- 12:28, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+145) . . m Farah Pandith (→Education)
- 12:27, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . m Farah Pandith (→Career)
- 12:27, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+267) . . Farah Pandith (→Education)
- 12:21, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,134) . . Farah Pandith (→Career)
- 11:57, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+435) . . Farah Pandith (→Publications)
- 11:53, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Farah Pandith (→Education)
- 11:37, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,650) . . Lobbying regulation - chronology 2020-2029 (3 March 2020 - Exclusive: Tory MP Paul Bristow Quits Private Lobbying Firm And Hands Directorship To...His Own Wife)
- 11:11, 9 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2,402) . . Lobbying regulation - chronology 2020-2029 (6 March 2020 - ExxonMobil 'tried to get European Green Deal watered down')
- 15:40, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . m Farah Pandith (ISD category added)
- 15:40, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2,281) . . N Farah Pandith (Basic page started)
- 15:12, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,078) . . N Shirley Lord Rosenthal (Basic profile created) (current)
- 12:29, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+74) . . m Serra Kirdar (Caspian Arts Foundation affiliation added) (current)
- 12:28, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+46) . . m Serra Kirdar (ISD category added)
- 12:25, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+275) . . m Serra Kirdar (ref added)
- 12:09, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1,994) . . N Serra Kirdar (Basic profile created)
- 11:33, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Institute for Strategic Dialogue (→ISD Board: - fixed mispelling of Kirdar which is mispelled on the ISD website)
- 11:27, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+788) . . Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg (→Affiliations)
- 11:12, 5 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+52) . . m Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg (→Affiliations)
- 13:20, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . m Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg (→Publications)
- 13:20, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2,427) . . Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg (publications section added)
- 12:51, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+93) . . Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg
- 12:43, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+515) . . Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg (→Political Career)
- 12:29, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg
- 12:28, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+546) . . Karl-Theodor zu Guttenberg (→Political Career)
- 12:15, 3 March 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+256) . . m Institute for Strategic Dialogue (2020 publication added)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)