User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:27, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Dan Senor (→Affiliations)
- 10:26, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Dan Senor (→Affiliations)
- 10:24, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+61) . . Dan Senor
- 10:20, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+39) . . Dan Senor
- 10:19, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . N Daniel Senor (Redirecting to Dan Senor) (current)
- 10:18, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+113) . . Saul Singer
- 10:17, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+113) . . Dan Senor
- 10:15, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+90) . . Dan Senor
- 10:14, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+219) . . Dan Senor
- 10:11, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . Dan Senor
- 10:11, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Dan Senor
- 10:10, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+273) . . Dan Senor
- 10:09, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+757) . . N Dan Senor (New page: Dan Senor is a former AIPAC intern who went on to become the spokesman for the Coalition Provisional Authority after the US invasion of Iraq. His sister runs AIPAC Jerusalem and his br...)
- 10:03, 5 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+275) . . Ground Zero Mosque (→Key Opponents)
- 22:40, 4 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . Ground Zero Mosque (→Key Opponents)
- 12:19, 4 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Bassem Eid (current)
- 12:18, 4 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . Bassem Eid
- 12:11, 4 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+179) . . Bassem Eid
- 20:16, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . N Steve J. Rosen (Redirecting to Steve Rosen) (current)
- 20:15, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,320) . . N Jane Harman (New page: Jane Margaret Lakes Harman (born 28 June 1945) is a conservative Democratic member of the United States House of Representatives, representing California's 36th congressional district. She...)
- 17:50, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . International Advisory Board for Academic Freedom
- 12:47, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+156) . . National Republican Trust Political Action Committee (current)
- 12:40, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+103) . . National Republican Trust Political Action Committee
- 11:55, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+54) . . N National Republican Trust Political Action Committee (New page: ==Principals== *Scott Wheeler - Executive Director)
- 11:52, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+95) . . Ground Zero Mosque (→Key Opponents)
- 11:49, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+107) . . Ground Zero Mosque
- 11:45, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+511) . . Jewish Americans for Sarah Palin (current)
- 11:38, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . Jewish Americans for Sarah Palin
- 11:36, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . Jewish Americans for Sarah Palin
- 11:29, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+345) . . N Benyamin Korn (New page: ==Affiliations== *Jewish Americans for Sarah Palin - director *The Jewish Exponent - former editor ==Resources== *Ami Eden, [http://blogs.jta.org/politics/article/2010/07/29/27402...) (current)
- 11:27, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+197) . . Jewish Americans for Sarah Palin
- 11:24, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . N Jewish Americans for Sarah Palin (New page: ==Principals== *Benyamin Korn category:Israel Lobby)
- 11:23, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+79) . . Emergency Committee for Israel (→Associations)
- 00:02, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+27) . . N Rachel Decter (Redirecting to Rachel Abrams) (current)
- 00:02, 3 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+593) . . N Moshe Decter (New page: Moshe Decter was the former editor of AIPAC's Near East Report. He is the father of Rachel Decter, the former husband of Midge Decter and the father-in-law of [[Elliot ...)
- 23:52, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . Reuel Marc Gerecht
- 23:50, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+313) . . Rachel Abrams (current)
- 21:36, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+93) . . Shoshana Bryen (current)
- 21:34, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+41) . . Stephen Bryen (current)
- 21:32, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . Shoshana Bryen
- 21:32, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+69) . . Stephen Bryen (→Affiliations)
- 21:30, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . Jewish Institute for National Security Affairs (→Principals)
- 21:27, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . Jewish Institute for National Security Affairs (→Principals)
- 21:26, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+552) . . N Tom Neumann (New page: Tom Neumann is the executive director of JINSA. In 1999 The Forward vote Neumann the "6th Most Influential Jewish Leader". ==Affiliations== *JINSA - executive director *[[B'nai B...)
- 21:16, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+224) . . N Shoshana Bryen (New page: ==Affiliations== *American Enterprise Institute - former editor of AEI journal Public Opinion *JINSA - Senior director for security policy Bryen, Shoshana[[Cat...)
- 21:08, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Jewish Institute for National Security Affairs (→Principals)
- 21:07, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+37) . . Jewish Institute for National Security Affairs (→Principals)
- 21:05, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+275) . . David Steinmann
- 21:03, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . David Steinmann
- 20:57, 2 August 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+55) . . Jewish Institute for National Security Affairs
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)