User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 16:19, 15 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+150) . . Jose Maria Aznar
- 16:16, 15 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+8,976) . . Dore Gold (page pasted from neocon europe)
- 16:13, 15 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+3,375) . . N Friends of Israel Initiative (New page: '''The Friends of Israel Initiative''' is a neoconservative Israel lobby group founded in 2010 by former Spanish Prime Minister José María Aznar and a number of other right-wing publ...)
- 15:55, 15 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Robert Agostinelli
- 15:52, 15 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+6,164) . . N Robert Agostinelli (New page: '''Robert Francesco Agostinelli''' (born 21 May 1953), also known as '''Roberto Agostinelli''', is a billionaire financier who runs the private equity firm Rhone Group with his partner...)
- 14:45, 15 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Friends of Israel - The Founder Members.pdf (current)
- 10:23, 9 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+243) . . Localis (→Origins and history: ref for Lord Hanningfield arrest)
- 15:38, 8 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . David Wolfson
- 15:37, 8 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+95) . . David Wolfson
- 15:36, 8 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+883) . . N David Wolfson (New page: '''David Wolfson, Baron Wolfson of Sunningdale''' (born 9 November 1935) is a British politician and businessman. He was Thatcher's Chief of Staff from 1979 to 1985. ...)
- 15:19, 8 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+196) . . Simon Wolfson
- 15:17, 8 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:The Charles Wolfson Charitable Trust - Contact & Trustees.JPG (current)
- 14:24, 8 July 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:The Charles Wolfson Charitable Trust - Charity framework.JPG (current)
- 07:18, 29 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Jarret Brachman (→Biography)
- 07:17, 29 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+125) . . Jarret Brachman
- 07:15, 29 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Global Jihadism.jpg (current)
- 07:13, 29 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,738) . . N Jarret Brachman (New page: '''Jarret M. Brachman''' is a terrorism expert and the former Director of Research in the Combating Terrorism Center at West Point. He claims to be an expert on 'Jihadist ideology, str...)
- 07:00, 29 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Jarretbrachman-net.pdf (current)
- 06:57, 29 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Www-ctc-usma-edu.pdf (current)
- 13:01, 15 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . m Matthew d'Ancona
- 10:42, 15 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+63) . . Matthew d'Ancona
- 10:40, 15 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+345) . . Matthew d'Ancona (opening quote)
- 10:38, 15 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-93) . . Ralph Harris (opening quote style)
- 09:55, 15 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+227) . . Alan Peacock (ref fmt)
- 11:30, 10 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+108) . . Simon Wolfson
- 10:15, 10 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . m Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees)
- 09:39, 10 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Policy Exchange (→Personnel)
- 09:10, 10 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+367) . . Policy Exchange (→Personnel: diagram)
- 09:01, 10 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Affiliations of current and former PX trustees.jpg (current)
- 14:37, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Policy Exchange (→Directors)
- 12:10, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Policy Exchange (→Directors)
- 12:09, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-11) . . Policy Exchange (→Media exposure)
- 12:07, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+117) . . Policy Exchange (→Media exposure)
- 12:05, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Policy Exchange (→Media exposure)
- 12:04, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+466) . . Policy Exchange (→Media exposure)
- 11:54, 9 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,921) . . Policy Exchange (Media exposure section)
- 21:48, 6 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+66) . . British Broadcasting Corporation (→Key figures)
- 14:09, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Evan Davis (→Resources)
- 14:07, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Evan Davis
- 14:06, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+382) . . Evan Davis
- 13:56, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+236) . . British Broadcasting Corporation
- 13:51, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . British Broadcasting Corporation (→Greg Dyke and Jeff Randall)
- 13:51, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . British Broadcasting Corporation (→Online services)
- 13:50, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Evan Davis, Dragons' Den.jpg (current)
- 13:44, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+573) . . British Broadcasting Corporation (→Key figures)
- 13:44, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+573) . . Robert Peston (→Views)
- 12:06, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,057) . . Robert Peston (→Biogrpahy)
- 12:06, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+751) . . Robert Peston
- 12:00, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,813) . . Robert Peston (profile expanded)
- 11:24, 4 June 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . British Broadcasting Corporation (→Key figures)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)