User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 18:48, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Colin Barrow (→Politics and political donations and think-tanks)
- 18:45, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . Colin Barrow (Conservative Party Category)
- 18:15, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+866) . . Policy Exchange (→Reports on British Muslims)
- 18:11, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-143) . . Policy Exchange (→Foreign Policy & Security: dean godson photo removed)
- 18:10, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . Policy Exchange (→Foreign Policy & Security)
- 18:09, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+39) . . m Policy Exchange (→Foreign Policy & Security: Reports on British Muslims subsection)
- 18:07, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-22) . . m Policy Exchange (→Events)
- 18:05, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Policy Exchange
- 18:03, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+112) . . Policy Exchange (→Foreign Policy & Security)
- 17:54, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees)
- 17:52, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Virginia Fraser (Virgina Fraser moved to Virginia Fraser) (current)
- 17:51, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+17) . . m Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees)
- 17:50, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-22) . . Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees (as at 16 April 2010))
- 17:48, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2,238) . . Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees (as at 16 April 2010))
- 08:16, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-18) . . Colin Barrow (→Politics and political donations and think-tanks)
- 08:15, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-7) . . m Colin Barrow (→Politics and political donations and think-tanks)
- 08:14, 29 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-9) . . m Colin Barrow (→Politics and political donations and think-tanks)
- 19:06, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Colin Barrow
- 19:04, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Colin Barrow.jpg (current)
- 18:54, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Man Group (→Former staff: colin barrow)
- 18:54, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Colin Barrow
- 18:53, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Colin Barrow (→Politics and political donations and think-tanks)
- 18:53, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+81) . . Colin Barrow (→Politics and political donations and think-tanks)
- 18:52, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-234) . . Colin Barrow
- 18:52, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+5,832) . . N Colin Barrow (New page: Colin Barrow (born 18 June 1952) is a millionaire hedge fund manager, local politician and Conservative Party donor. He is a co-founder <ref>[[Media:Colin Barrow - The Politician....)
- 17:38, 28 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Colin Barrow - The Politician.pdf (current)
- 20:55, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Elizabeth Noel (current)
- 20:55, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,836) . . N Elizabeth Noel (New page: '''Elizabeth Mary Alice Noel''' (born 24 September 1967), known as '''Lizzie Noel''' or '''Lizzie Pitman''' (the latter being her married name), is a former Conservative Party candidat...)
- 20:39, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Policy Exchange (→Current and former trustees (as at 16 April 2010))
- 20:31, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+2,287) . . N Simon Wolfson (New page: '''Simon Adam Wolfson''' (born 27 October 1967) is a British businessman who has donated substantial sums to the Conservative Party. He currently chief executive of the clothing retail...)
- 19:18, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1,347) . . N Timothy Steel (New page: '''Timothy Michael Steel''' (born 3 April 1952) is a British financier and former stock broker with Cazenove, the firm widely assumed to be the appointed stockbroker to The Queen. He w...)
- 19:16, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Committed Capital - Tim Steel.pdf (current)
- 18:42, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+974) . . N Edward Sells (New page: '''Edward Andrew Perronet Sells''' (born 30 November 1948) is a British Chartered Accountant and Conservative Party donor. He was appointed a Trustee of the right-wing think-tank [[Pol...)
- 18:26, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . m The Hijacking of British Islam
- 18:25, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+102) . . The Hijacking of British Islam
- 18:25, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . m Dean Godson
- 18:22, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+352) . . The Hijacking of British Islam
- 18:09, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m The Hijacking of British Islam
- 18:06, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . The Hijacking of British Islam
- 18:04, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . The Hijacking of British Islam (fmt + links)
- 17:50, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+181) . . The Hijacking of British Islam
- 17:45, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-118) . . The Hijacking of British Islam
- 17:42, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+186) . . The Hijacking of British Islam
- 17:40, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+5,028) . . The Hijacking of British Islam (info pasted from neocon europe)
- 16:02, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Alfred Sherman (→Affiliations)
- 16:02, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . Alfred Sherman (→Affiliations: Gideon Sherman)
- 13:10, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Realite EU Screenscrab.JPG (current)
- 13:08, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Réalité EU
- 13:07, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (+69) . . Réalité EU
- 13:04, 27 April 2010 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Logo realite.jpg (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)