Search results
Create the page "Peter Hunter" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- ...2007. <ref>‘[http://www.ukwhoswho.com/view/article/oupww/whoswho/U42364 HUNTER, Angela Margaret Jane, (Anji)]’, ''Who's Who 2011'', A & C Black, 2011; o ...urning the company around, [[David Simon]] ([[Lord Simon of Highbury]]), [[Peter Sutherland]] and following them the current group chief executive [[John Br16 KB (2,395 words) - 14:19, 12 July 2016
- :# Sir [[Tom Hunter]] Property and sports goods *[[Peter_Clarke_(journalist)|Peter Clarke]] - the right wing former Scottish correspondent of the Economist: W15 KB (1,920 words) - 11:05, 2 November 2011
- |Director||'''[[Peter Ackerman]]'''|| |[[Chairman]]||'''[[Peter G. Peterson]]'''33 KB (4,955 words) - 07:16, 19 February 2011
- ...hat [[PMO]] (Project Management Office) security chief Brigadier [[Anthony Hunter-Choat]] and Brigadier General [[James Ellery]] helped formulate the specifi *[[Peter Inge|Peter Anthony Inge]] - 20000 ordinary shares held as at 26/03/2010.<ref>Aegis Def19 KB (2,808 words) - 07:56, 22 March 2018
- ...d campaigns for clients such as [[Kent County Council]] and entrepreneur [[Peter Jones]] and a former director at [[Bell Pottinger]].<ref name="AR"/> ...son]] | [[Kristin Heume]] | [[Siobhan Hill]] | [[Imogen Hulbert]] | [[Anji Hunter]] | [[Elliot Langley]] | [[Stephanie Lvovich]] | [[Adam Lynch]] | [[Anthony68 KB (8,353 words) - 13:31, 3 March 2017
- *[[Peter Szanton]] — the policy analyst and former President of New York Rand ...lip Lader]], [[Peter Lowy]], [[Charles N. Martin, Jr.]], [[Bonnie McElveen-Hunter]], [[Ronald Olson]], [[Paul O'Neill (cabinet member)|Paul O'Neill]], [[Mich14 KB (1,957 words) - 11:37, 3 November 2008
- *[[Peter Sutherland]] (age 59), appointed to the Board in January 2001, Peter Sutherland is an Irish national. He is a former attorney general of Ireland *[[Archie Hunter]]: Appointed to the Board in September 2004, Hunter is a Chartered Accountant. He was Scottish senior partner of KPMG between 136 KB (4,963 words) - 06:50, 11 September 2015
- ...ol industry that he would like the industry's collaboration. He spoke to [[Peter Mitchell]] Director of Strategic Affairs at [[Guinness]] who agreed he'd do *[[Peter Litherland]]27 KB (3,977 words) - 10:52, 1 October 2012
- ...difficult days of the first Thatcher administration its Director General - Peter Saville, he was supported throughout by Matthey’s successor, Gerald Thorl Peter Savill stood down as Director General in 1986 for personal reasons to do w111 KB (15,701 words) - 15:53, 1 October 2014
- #[[Gordon Beattie]] (references added by Peter) #[[Ian Austin]] referenced - peter96 KB (13,077 words) - 06:20, 14 November 2012
- ...rism is only part of his enormous productivity in many areas.’ <ref>Alex Peter Schmid, A. J. Jongman, Michael Stohl, Political Terrorism (Transaction Publ ...the study of terrorism can manage with a minimum of theory.’ <ref>Alex Peter Schmid, A. J. Jongman, Michael Stohl, Political Terrorism (Transaction Publ21 KB (3,074 words) - 10:25, 7 April 2009
- * [[Peter Rost (UK politician)|Peter Rost]], (Derbyshire, S.E.) ...ace policies]</ref>. Three MPs [[Andrew Hunter (British politician)|Andrew Hunter]], [[Andrew Rosindell]] and [[Angela Watkinson]], were ordered to resign fr24 KB (3,549 words) - 19:51, 29 April 2011
- :1991 Military assistant to Gen [[Peter de la Billière]] ==The Peter McBride case==11 KB (1,724 words) - 23:19, 11 January 2011
- ...Under Secretary of State, Foreign and Commonwealth Office. | The Honorable Peter JAY. Formerly British Ambassador to the United States of America. | Sir Jo ...DL. Formerly Director, [[Royal Institute of International Affairs]]. | Sir Peter MIDDLETON, GCB. President, The [[British Bankers’ Association]]. Forme22 KB (3,015 words) - 14:46, 17 February 2011
- The Honorable [[Peter Sutherland]] Ambassador [[Robert Hunter]]5 KB (717 words) - 20:10, 18 December 2006
- *[[Jim Hunter]], Facilities Director, [[Standard Life Assurance Company]] *[[Peter Bell]], Director, FreshStart Software Ltd2 KB (211 words) - 17:22, 27 January 2007
- *[[Lister Peter]] *[[Swan Hunter Group]]19 KB (2,123 words) - 20:36, 1 October 2007
- ASHWORTH, PETER E. Central Council 1982 BROWN, PETER, BOSWELL Sheffield 192617 KB (2,252 words) - 10:02, 19 February 2007
- When Peter Mandelson was Trade and Industry Secretary, he told the CBI that his brief Tom Hunter Gave £100,00061 KB (8,658 words) - 18:46, 5 November 2012
- ...to Cameron’s leadership campaign along with fellow donor [[Peter Gummer|Peter Gummer, Lord Chadlington]]), [[Andrew Allum]], [[Henry Angest]], [[Sir John ...igative Journalists]], a July 2014 report by ''The Guardian'' found that [[Peter de Putron]] - brother-in-law of Andrea Leadsom and founder of De Putron Fun79 KB (11,371 words) - 07:02, 29 January 2018