Search results
Create the page "Board" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- Helm holds a number of advisory board appointments in Britain and Europe, including as Independent Chair of the [ ...]] until 2012; member of the [[DTI]]'s [[Sustainable Energy Panel Advisory Board]] from 2002 to 2007 (also on the DTI's Energy Advisory Panel from 1993 to 215 KB (2,281 words) - 13:59, 27 January 2017
- ...[Health and Safety Laboratory]]. She also chaired the [[UK Fusion Advisory Board]] for the Research Council. <ref name="veteran"> Ellie Zolfagharifard, [htt ...n the Government's ad-hoc 2012 [[Nuclear Research and Development Advisory Board]]7 KB (1,126 words) - 11:46, 30 October 2013
- ...ref|2}} and is used by Stevenson to channel funds from corporations on the board of which he sits. For example the 2002 Annual Report of HBOS noted that:2 KB (294 words) - 11:23, 2 February 2007
- ...rd>The Jewish Policy Center, [http://www.jewishpolicycenter.org/board.php "Board"], JPC, accessed on 13 November 2010</ref>13 KB (1,937 words) - 03:21, 26 February 2015
- ...d-raising purposes.(77) Livingstone is a member of ASC's national strategy board. He has also been an official of the Washington lobbying firm [[Gray and Co9 KB (1,393 words) - 19:30, 30 December 2007
- ...e editorial board of the [[Jaffee Center]] in Tel Aviv and on the advisory board of JINSA. In the 1950s, Laqueur was founding editor of the British journal11 KB (1,824 words) - 16:11, 3 November 2007
- ...] Major General [[Daniel O. Graham]], a member of [[CAUSA USA]]'s advisory board, heads the Star Wars lobby group, [[High Frontier]]. [[F. Lynn Bouchey]], p2 KB (251 words) - 22:49, 2 August 2014
- ...id Charters]] and [[Maurice Tugwell]] and serves on the editorial advisory board of 'Conflict Quarterly' (edited by Charters).19 KB (3,013 words) - 16:39, 8 January 2009
- ...CAUSA-affiliated U.S. Global Strategy Council, and serves on the editorial board of the Moon-owned monthly magazine, 'The World and I', edited by [[Arnaud d ...of directors of the [[Nathan Hale Foundation]] and serves on the editorial board of [[Yonah Alexander]]'s journal, 'Terrorism'.7 KB (1,055 words) - 22:25, 9 March 2006
- *1988 International advisory board [[Political Communication and Persuasion]]5 KB (672 words) - 17:01, 11 November 2014
- ...[[International Center for Terrorism Studies]] as well as a member of the Board of Regents. Concurrently, he is Director of the [[Inter-University Center f15 KB (2,056 words) - 22:12, 22 February 2010
- ...Wilkinson, because of his position in the Civil Service, did not join the board of the ISC. He did, however, recommend to Crozier the man who would become29 KB (4,431 words) - 15:36, 23 November 2021
- ...[Paul Wilkinson]], who had been the key figure in RISCT, resigned from the board. <ref>'Diary: Conflict takes over from terrorism', The Independent, 15 Apri13 KB (1,838 words) - 09:09, 24 December 2008
- *[[NewsMax.com]] – Board of Directors *[[U.S. Global Strategy Council]] – Board of Directors11 KB (1,667 words) - 10:02, 3 December 2012
- ...rrington|Lord Carrington]]. The two other party political members of that board are [[Alan Lee Williams]] and [[Lord Holme]] of Cheltenham. 3 ...David Owen]], was one of a batch of younger SDP figures selected by the UK board for Successor Generation membership in its early days a decade ago.26 KB (4,066 words) - 21:14, 18 February 2011
- ...n]]. [[Walter Laqueur]] of [[CSIS]] and [[JINSA]] is also on the editorial board.'<ref>The "Terrorism" Industry: The Experts and Institutions That Shape Our13 KB (1,927 words) - 20:10, 6 April 2015
- ...s Den] (Accessed: 20 October 2007)</ref> He is also on the Policy Advisory Board of the [[Social Market Foundation]] a neoliberal free market think tank.<re *[[Social Market Foundation]] – Member of the Policy Advisory Board (from date tbc - present), has acted as its Company Secretary and written p3 KB (401 words) - 11:07, 19 October 2017
- The Chairman of the Board is Dennis Stevenson. In addition there are five executive directors and eig ===Past Board Members===23 KB (3,095 words) - 14:26, 28 January 2015
- == Board of Directors == ...Committee <ref>[http://www.firstgroup.com/corpfirst/investor/board.php The Board of Directors]</ref>5 KB (588 words) - 15:35, 13 July 2015
- ...he]] for Scotland and Northern Ireland, and until September 2003, was a UK Board member of [[Deloitte & Touche]]. He is also a Governor and Non-executive Di ...[http://www.hbosplc.com/investors/results/annualreports/2004/board.htm The Board] accessed 31st January 2007600 bytes (88 words) - 13:52, 31 January 2007