User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 20:45, 17 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . National Information Directorate (→See also) (current)
- 20:43, 17 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+307) . . National Information Directorate (→People)
- 11:10, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Community development)
- 11:09, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . N The Faith & Belief Forum (Redirected page to Faith and Belief Forum) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 11:08, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Community development)
- 11:08, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . Exilarch’s Foundation
- 11:08, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Community development)
- 11:07, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+139) . . N File:Screenshot 2022-05-13 at 11.51.58.png (THE EXILARCH'S FOUNDATION ANNUAL REPORT AND FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FOR THE YEAR ENDED 31 DECEMBER 2020. Charity No: 275919.) (current)
- 11:06, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+132) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Community development)
- 11:05, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (-7) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Hospitals, Medical Education and Research)
- 11:05, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Hospitals, Medical Education and Research)
- 11:03, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→Ethics)
- 11:02, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Exilarch’s Foundation (→SOCIAL WELFARE)
- 11:02, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+2,084) . . N Exilarch’s Foundation (Created page with " ==People== *David Dangoor ==Grant recipients 2020 | 2019== ===SOCIAL WELFARE=== ====Community development====| *Jewish Leadership Council200,000100,000| *The Co...")
- 10:20, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Former directors) (current)
- 10:17, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+23) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Directors)
- 10:14, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+7,292) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Directors)
- 09:53, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . UK Lawyers for Israel
- 09:52, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+135) . . UK Lawyers for Israel
- 09:50, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→People)
- 09:48, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Funding)
- 09:48, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+200) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Contact)
- 09:43, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+242) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Trustees (and date of appointment))
- 09:36, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+344) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→People)
- 09:32, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+235) . . UK Lawyers for Israel
- 09:29, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+202) . . UK Lawyers for Israel (→Funding)
- 09:13, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+20) . . Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation (→2020 | 2019)
- 09:12, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation (→2020 | 2019)
- 09:11, 13 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+281) . . Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation (→2020 | 2019)
- 21:09, 12 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+1,931) . . N Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation (Created page with " ==Grant recipients== ===2020 | 2019=== *AJEX Charitable Foundation4,000- Amigour/Jewish Agency25,000-Beis Brucha1,000- *BICOM (via the JLC)25,000- *Board of Deputi...")
- 20:53, 12 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . N Gerald Ronson Family Foundation (Redirected page to Gerald and Gail Ronson Family Foundation) (current) (Tag: New redirect)
- 19:03, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Efraim Karsh (→Bibliographical analysis) (current)
- 19:01, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+41) . . N File:Screenshot 2022-05-11 at 19.25.35.png (Ephraim Karsh citations) (current)
- 19:00, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . Atkin Charitable Foundation (→Grant recipients)
- 14:39, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Lara Atkin Charitable Foundation (→Trustees)
- 13:50, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+85) . . Lara Atkin Charitable Foundation (→Trustees)
- 13:49, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . Lara Atkin Charitable Foundation
- 13:48, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+155) . . N File:Screenshot 2022-05-11 at 14.41.35.png (LARA ATKIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION, UNAUDITED TRUSTEES’ REPORT AND FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FOR THE YEAR ENDED 5 APRIL 2021. Screengrab, p.9.) (current)
- 13:46, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+308) . . N Lara Atkin Charitable Foundation (Created page with " ==Trustees== *Lara Atkin ==Grant recipients== Recipient | 2020 | 2021 *Solutions Not Sides| 15,000 | 15,000<ref>LARA ATKIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION [ UN...")
- 13:37, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+69) . . Lara Eliza Atkin (→Notes) (current)
- 13:22, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+96) . . Catkin Pussywillow Charitable Trust
- 13:21, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+156) . . N File:Screenshot 2022-05-11 at 14.19.06.png (CATKIN PUSSYWILLOW CHARITABLE TRUST UNAUDITED TRUSTEES' REPORT AND FINANCIAL STATEMENTS FOR THE YEAR ENDED 5 APRIL 2017. Screengrab, p. 10) (current)
- 13:20, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Catkin Pussywillow Charitable Trust (→Grant recipients)
- 13:20, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+508) . . N Catkin Pussywillow Charitable Trust (Created page with "==Grant recipients== | 2017 | 2016 | *Board of Deputies |- |10,000 *Friends of Hebrew University| - |5,000 *Jewish Leadership Council | 30,000 | 5,000 *Kings Coll...")
- 13:15, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (-138) . . Lara Eliza Atkin
- 13:10, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . Lara Eliza Atkin
- 13:08, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Lara Eliza Atkin (→Affiliations)
- 13:08, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Lara Eliza Atkin (→Company directorships)
- 13:07, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+134) . . Lara Eliza Atkin
- 13:06, 11 May 2022 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . Lara Eliza Atkin
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)