Search results
Create the page "1976" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- *1976-79 FCO3 KB (509 words) - 22:17, 11 December 2013
- ...Impact of Right-wing Politics in England 1903-32", University of Illinois, 1976. Quoted in Lobster #11 and referred to by Webber.35 KB (5,533 words) - 20:46, 1 February 2008
- *[[John Coyle]] - worked together at Broad Street PR from 1976 until 19886 KB (799 words) - 12:10, 22 February 2012
- ...es with [[Brian Basham]], founder of the PR firm [[Broad Street Group]] in 1976 and worked with him until 1988. According to ''PR Week'':2 KB (300 words) - 12:11, 22 February 2012
- James Hughes-Hallett joined the Swire Group in 1976. He has held various management positions in the Group's operations in Asia2 KB (328 words) - 23:13, 25 January 2007
- ...chell Fromstein]], who had been appointed president and CEO of Manpower in 1976. Stevenson reinstated Fromstein and he remained in these positions until hi11 KB (1,584 words) - 12:28, 2 November 2008
- John joined Arthur Andersen in 1976 and became Head of their world-wide Financial Services Industry practice in1 KB (161 words) - 19:37, 16 June 2007
- ...cess, in 1972, and early computer-linked cash dispensers, Servicetills, in 1976. Deregulation in the 1980s, culminating in 'Big Bang' in 1986, also encoura5 KB (645 words) - 08:27, 8 April 2008
- 1976 - 19792 KB (268 words) - 17:16, 14 September 2007
- *1975-1976 military service in the Netherlands.3 KB (367 words) - 11:47, 5 December 2010
- ...len gets the heave-ho', ''Daily Express'', 15 May 1984, p. 17</ref>between 1976 and 1980.<ref name="LinkedIn"> LinkedIn [http://uk.linkedin.com/pub/nigel-o46 KB (6,934 words) - 04:17, 19 March 2018
- ..., Mobbs was also Vice-president of the [[British Chambers of Commerce]] in 1976 and the [[British Property Federation]] (1979-81) and a member of the Counc3 KB (492 words) - 22:52, 9 December 2010
- *[[Business Council on National Issues]] (Canada) - Founded in 1976 by the CEOs of US-based [[Imperial Oil]] and [[Noranda]], the BNCI is Canad30 KB (4,304 words) - 11:56, 2 September 2008
- ...1969, volii p12. Quoted in Margaret Morris, "The General Strike", Penguin 197637 KB (5,842 words) - 14:51, 17 August 2007
- ...clue to this is given in an unusual place: ''A Man Called Intrepid''. This 1976 biography of [[William Stephenson]], the head of British Security Co-ordina ...s, the references in William Stevenson "A Man Called Intrepid", Macmillan, 1976 and Eugene Spiers "Focus" (1963) the most substantial study of the Focus is60 KB (9,504 words) - 20:51, 1 February 2008
- ...nd White though no longer its Director was its publicity advisor from 1945-1976. ...ve of The [[Rugby Portland Cement]] Co. Ltd. and subsidiaries from 1933 to 1976. Later a director of the [[Granada Group]]. A member of the [[Carlton Club]39 KB (6,147 words) - 14:16, 20 August 2007
- ...allaghan, who took over from Wilson when he surprisingly resigned in April 1976.44 KB (7,134 words) - 20:18, 12 September 2007
- ANDREWES, E. D. E. Central Council 1972-1976 res 1977 CHAMBERLAIN Central Council 1976, 197717 KB (2,252 words) - 10:02, 19 February 2007
- *[[Anthony Barmore Hampton]] 19762 KB (190 words) - 14:20, 13 September 2007
- ...Impact of Right-wing Politics in England 1903-32", University of Illinois, 1976 *Margaret Morris, "The General Strike", Penguin 19768 KB (1,139 words) - 14:01, 13 September 2007