Search results
Create the page "Campaign for a Free Parliament" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
- ...where Moonman is a leading light in the [[Association of Former Members of Parliament]]]] ...ciation of Former Members of Congress]], and the [[Inter-University Center for Legal Studies]] of the [[International Law Institute]].">qZVuwzbNcHQ</youtu35 KB (5,091 words) - 15:54, 9 May 2012
- ...n "affiliate" organisation in Brussels, called the [[International Council for Capital Formation]], which is run by Dr. [[Margo Thorning]] (see below). It ...l_Formation#Footnotes] An indication of likely funders can be gleamed from a decade ago. In the early nineties, ACCF admitted that its programme called30 KB (4,393 words) - 10:06, 7 July 2010
- ...(''1999- '') from [[Christian Democratic Union of Germany]].<ref>European Parliament, [http://www.europarl.europa.eu/members/archive/alphaOrder/view.do?language : 15.09.2004 / 13.03.2007 : Delegation for relations with the Maghreb countries and the Arab Maghreb Union (including10 KB (1,296 words) - 11:15, 2 April 2012
- In September 2003 the [[Scottish Parliament]] launched a science project to afford MSPs access to 'reliable and factual information' ...ish Parliament. The Scheme is a collaborative project between the Scottish Parliament Information Centre (SPICe), the [[Royal Society of Edinburgh]] (RSE) and th4 KB (616 words) - 22:13, 2 September 2010
- ...ies]] (BUCSIS).<ref>[http://www.bucsis.co.uk/ Buckingham University Centre for Security and Intelligence Studies], 6 may 2009.</ref> ...in Modern European History from [[St. Catherine’s College]], Oxford, and a DPhil also at Oxford University. He lectured at the [[University of Warwick27 KB (4,127 words) - 09:14, 13 November 2017
- ...ost academic terrorologists in the UK and served as an active propagandist for Western state interests throughout his long career. He retired from academi ...In The East', ''The Sunday Herald''. 12 January 2003</ref> where he served for six years until 1965 when he retired at the rank of Flight Lieutenant.<ref>96 KB (14,650 words) - 11:21, 10 November 2013
- ...[[RCP]] name. He has also been a speaker at [[Institute of Ideas]] events (for example on Wednesday 14 March 2007)<ref>Institute of Ideas [http://www.inst Gillott has a first degree in Mathematics.45 KB (6,483 words) - 19:06, 29 March 2015
- ...He was also on the non-executive advisory council for the pro-vivisection campaign group ‘[[Understanding Animal Research]]’ in 2009<ref name="who2009">Un ...pport Groups (since 1993) of which he became president in 1995. He is also a long serving advisor to the [[Progress Educational Trust]] although he does37 KB (5,408 words) - 15:59, 10 April 2015
- ...[John Krebs]], in Oxford University's Zoology Department since 1988. He is a Royal Society research professor specialising in mathematical biology. ...ame time he issued guidelines establishing openness rather than secrecy as a fundamental principle of their activities. Far from dismissing the anti-sci9 KB (1,488 words) - 06:40, 16 February 2015
- ...uch research was felt to have been secured, 'there was still an unmet need for public education in the field of human reproduction and genetics.' And so P ...n exists to make sure that access to new technologies is not restricted by parliament or by doctors'.6 KB (943 words) - 09:01, 16 October 2013
- ...was merging B-M with [[Cohn & Wolfe]] to become Burson Cohn & Wolfe (BCW), a network of more than 4,000 employees, across 42 countries. ...government and creating '[[astroturfing]]' campaigns PR helps to maintain a legislative environment on which industry can avoid real change.60 KB (7,789 words) - 01:17, 9 November 2018
- ...ristian Social Union in Bavaria]] (''CSU'') since 19.07.1994.<ref>European Parliament, [http://www.europarl.europa.eu/members/archive/alphaOrder/view.do?language *Substitute, Delegation for relations with Israel9 KB (1,282 words) - 20:13, 2 April 2012
- ...or Robin Ramsay and was an early attempt to understand the significance of a nexus of intelligence connected groups which covertly influenced the politi ...Labour Party members believe that it was once a socialist party, began as a178 KB (28,232 words) - 12:30, 7 September 2022
- ...nergy supply and how it can help power the world's economic development in a sustainable way". Its members believe that nuclear energy is a "safe, reliable, economic and environmentally acceptable way of providing e12 KB (1,731 words) - 03:52, 24 October 2013
- ...MEP (''1999- '') from [[Christian Social Union in Bavaria]].<ref>European Parliament, [http://www.europarl.europa.eu/members/archive/alphaOrder/view.do?language : 29.09.2009 / ... : Delegation for relations with the Arab Peninsula11 KB (1,362 words) - 20:19, 2 April 2012
- ...s for two terms between 1994-2004 in the European Parliament.<ref>European Parliament, [http://www.europarl.europa.eu/members/archive/alphaOrder/view.do?language : 22.07.1999 / 14.01.2002 : Delegation for relations with the countries of Central America and Mexico12 KB (1,511 words) - 10:50, 16 April 2012
- ...ic Party|Free Democratic Party - The Liberals]] (since 2004).<ref>European Parliament, [http://www.europarl.europa.eu/members/archive/alphaOrder/view.do?language : 14.07.2009 / ... : Group of the Alliance of Liberals and Democrats for Europe5 KB (587 words) - 20:45, 2 April 2012
- ...from [[Christian Democratic Union of Germany]] (since 1994).<ref>European Parliament, [http://www.europarl.europa.eu/members/archive/alphaOrder/view.do?language : 30.09.2009 / ... : Delegation for relations with the countries of Southeast Asia and the Association of South12 KB (1,533 words) - 11:02, 2 April 2012
- ...whoswho.com/view/article/oupww/whoswho/U7631 BIRT]’, ''Who's Who 2010'', A & C Black, 2010; online edn, Oxford University Press, Dec 2009 ; online edn ...> [http://www.parliament.uk/biographies/lords/lord-birt/2533 Lord Birth] ''Parliament.UK'', accessed 10 December 2014 </ref>12 KB (1,763 words) - 11:16, 22 December 2014
- ...nd Free Press'' newspaper, he was a journalist until he became a Labour MP for the Scottish constituency Cunninghame North in 1987. <ref>[http://www.niauk ...rgy; Minister of State, Foreign and Commonwealth Office; Minister of State for the Scotland Office and Deputy Spokesperson, Trade and Industry. <ref>[http10 KB (1,512 words) - 15:51, 10 September 2012