User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 04:10, 23 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+309) . . N Roger Gale (started a page)
- 03:56, 23 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . William Cash (started a page)
- 03:56, 23 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+320) . . N William Cash (started a page)
- 03:51, 23 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m List of MPs, 51st UK Parliament (→Notes)
- 03:40, 23 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+934) . . List of MPs, 50th UK Parliament (→List of MPs as at 11 June 1987)
- 03:46, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+808) . . List of MPs, 49th UK Parliament (→List of MPs as at 9 June 1983)
- 03:32, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . N Edward du Cann (redirect Edward Du Cann) (current)
- 03:20, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Stan Orme (redirect Stanley Orme) (current)
- 02:40, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+894) . . N Douglas Jay (started a page) (current)
- 02:37, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . All Souls College, Oxford (→Notable Fellows) (current)
- 02:00, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+334) . . N Donald Dewar (started a page)
- 01:54, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+1,194) . . N Kenneth Baker (started a page)
- 00:09, 22 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+655) . . List of MPs, 48th UK Parliament (index)
- 18:46, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+151) . . Yuval Diskin (→External Resources)
- 18:41, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+17) . . Douglas Murray (→Articles)
- 18:15, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+159) . . Douglas Murray (→Articles)
- 17:22, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Paul Anderson (→Articles)
- 17:17, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+161) . . Paul Anderson (→Affiliations)
- 04:14, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+616) . . List of MPs, 47th UK Parliament (→List of MPs as at 10 October 1974)
- 03:51, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . List of MPs, 46th UK Parliament (→ABC)
- 03:50, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+632) . . List of MPs, 46th UK Parliament (index)
- 03:34, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . List of MPs, 45th UK Parliament (→DEF)
- 03:32, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . List of MPs, 45th UK Parliament (→ABC)
- 03:30, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . List of MPs, 45th UK Parliament (→ABC)
- 03:24, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+288) . . N Michael Foot (started a page)
- 03:18, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Edward Du Cann (typo)
- 03:18, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+993) . . N Edward Du Cann (started a page)
- 03:11, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+325) . . N Tom Driberg (started a page)
- 03:03, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+463) . . N William Deedes (started a page)
- 02:53, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Tam Dalyell (typo)
- 02:52, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+282) . . N Tam Dalyell (started a page)
- 02:48, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+327) . . N John Biggs-Davison (started a page)
- 02:41, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+574) . . N Anthony Barber (started a page)
- 02:32, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+454) . . List of MPs, 45th UK Parliament (→List of MPs as at 18 June 1970)
- 02:15, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,003) . . N List of MPs, 45th UK Parliament (started a page)
- 02:11, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,538) . . N List of MPs, 46th UK Parliament (started a page)
- 02:05, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . List of MPs, 47th UK Parliament (typo)
- 02:02, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,582) . . N List of MPs, 47th UK Parliament (started a page)
- 01:57, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,558) . . N List of MPs, 48th UK Parliament (started a page)
- 01:49, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,717) . . N List of MPs, 49th UK Parliament (started a page)
- 01:40, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,633) . . N List of MPs, 50th UK Parliament (started a page)
- 01:34, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . List of MPs, 51st UK Parliament (typo)
- 01:30, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . List of MPs, 51st UK Parliament (→D to F)
- 01:28, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+21,690) . . N List of MPs, 51st UK Parliament (started a page)
- 01:08, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . m List of MPs, 52nd UK Parliament (typo)
- 01:06, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m List of MPs, 52nd UK Parliament (typo)
- 01:05, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m List of MPs, 52nd UK Parliament (typo)
- 00:59, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . List of MPs, 52nd UK Parliament (→List of MPs as at 1 May 1997)
- 00:56, 21 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (+26,439) . . N List of MPs, 52nd UK Parliament (started a page)
- 17:33, 20 October 2013 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . m Denis Payne (→retirement)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)