Search results
Create the page "Mark" on this wiki! See also the search results found.
Page title matches
- ...tor of Chime Communications at the time of the management buy-out in 1989. Mark is a non-executive director of [[Holiday Extras Holdings]] Limited. [[Category:Lobbyists|Smith, Mark]]679 bytes (94 words) - 03:43, 8 September 2014
- 55 bytes (6 words) - 15:41, 24 June 2006
- '''Mark Palmer''' serves on the Board of Trustees with [[Freedom House]]. His biogr1 KB (211 words) - 14:54, 15 May 2009
- 64 bytes (8 words) - 18:27, 27 June 2006
- 63 bytes (7 words) - 23:07, 27 June 2006
- '''Mark Leonard''' is New Labour "foreign policy wunderkind"<ref>Perry Anderson, [h *Mark Leonard, ''Why Europe Will Run the 21st Century '', Fourth Estate, February696 bytes (83 words) - 16:25, 12 November 2007
- ...]] is Senior Vice President Corporate Operations, [[Genzyme Corporation]]. Mark leads Genzyme’s strategy on corporate supply chain and capacity infrastru ...erford in Ireland as well as the Framingham, USA and RenagelTM operations. Mark also drives core business support functions – quality, engineering, mater1 KB (149 words) - 10:22, 14 December 2006
- Mark Angelson is Chief Executive Officer of Chicago-based R.R. Donnelley & Sons3 KB (415 words) - 22:36, 12 November 2006
- '''Sir Mark Moody-Stuart''' (born September 15, 1940, Antigua) is chairman of [[Anglo A :25: Sir Mark Moody-Stuart4 KB (645 words) - 13:21, 8 October 2008
- [[Mark Huband]] is a former journalist who has moved into the work of corporate in According to ''Intelligence Online'', [[Mark Huband]] joined [[Hakluyt]], the business intelligence agency, in the summe2 KB (343 words) - 16:59, 23 March 2010
- [[Mark Adams]] might refer to: *[[Mark Adams (Solicitor)|Mark Adams]] the Australian solicitor,274 bytes (39 words) - 10:56, 6 October 2010
- '''Sir Mark Aubrey Weinberg''' (born 9 August 1931) founded the [[St James's Place Grou *[[British American Tobacco]]<ref>'[[Mark Weinberg]] and [[Maurice Lipworth]], both financiers, came onto the BAT boa1 KB (189 words) - 09:01, 2 October 2016
- Mark Kramer is a Senior Fellow working on the Corporate Social Responsibility In ...tion Strategy Group [http://www.fsg-impact.org/app/content/people/item/319 Mark Kramer], Accessed 26th August 2007.940 bytes (129 words) - 17:25, 23 April 2012
- Mark Fisher is a Labour MP for Stoke-on-Trent Central and former shadow Arts min ...ofile [http://www.theyworkforyou.com/mp/mark_fisher/stoke-on-trent_central Mark Fisher], Accessed 26th August.315 bytes (40 words) - 01:52, 17 April 2010
- [[Mark Birdwood]] was educated at Radley and Trinity College, Cambridge, before co Mark is a trustee of two charities and was on the Select Committee for Science a1 KB (171 words) - 14:16, 5 October 2007
- '''Mark Fisher''' was appointed to the Board of [[RBS]] in March 2006. He is Chie654 bytes (86 words) - 10:35, 26 August 2007
- [[File:Mark Durkan.jpg|200px|thumb|right|Mark Durkan]] ...d Assemby 2007 [http://www.niassembly.gov.uk/members/biogs_07/durkan_m.htm Mark Durkan]</ref>) is a nationalist politician in Northern Ireland and the lead5 KB (769 words) - 13:45, 27 January 2017
- Mark C. Medish is a lawyer/partner with Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, one o2 KB (246 words) - 11:09, 7 August 2007
- '''Mark Byford''' is the deputy director general and head of BBC Journalism College [[Category:Journalists|Byford, Mark]]348 bytes (46 words) - 13:12, 11 September 2008
- ...http://www.shropshirestar.com/news/2015/05/08/wrekin/ Wrekin: Conservative Mark Pritchard wins seat] ''Shropshire Star'', 8 May 2015, accessed 18 May 2015 ...for investigation.<ref> [http://www.bbc.co.uk/news/uk-politics-24827405 MP Mark Pritchard denies Albania business claims], ''BBC News'', 5 November 2013 La5 KB (648 words) - 15:27, 19 February 2016
Page text matches
- *The Hon. [[Mark Laing]] (Vice Chairman), Managing Director, [[Simmers of Edinburgh]]3 KB (279 words) - 22:04, 24 November 2008
- *[[Mark Hope]] [[Shell UK Exploration & Production]]8 KB (1,212 words) - 13:00, 12 February 2010
- ...e very highest levels. We hope to see more outcomes like this contract.' [[Mark Selway]], Chief Executive of the Weir Group. *[[Mark Selway]] Chief Executive9 KB (1,403 words) - 14:25, 15 January 2018
- {{Template:Northern_Ireland_badge}}[[Mark Haddock]] is a former [[RUC]] and [[PSNI]] Special Branch informant within ...VF|Haddock, Mark]][[Category:State Violence and Collusion Project|Haddock, Mark]]2 KB (271 words) - 14:47, 23 August 2012
- *[[Mark Smith]] - Non-Executive Director *[[Mark Canning]] - Senior adviser - Asia58 KB (7,320 words) - 12:42, 20 July 2019
- *[[Mark Schmid]], client services director7 KB (785 words) - 12:45, 5 September 2016
- ...eputy Chairman | [[Christopher Satterthwaite]] - Group Chief Executive | [[Mark Smith]] - Financial Director | [[Richard Alston]] Director | [[Catherine Br4 KB (474 words) - 01:02, 19 November 2013
- ...uld be available in the public domain the way the works of Shakespeare and Mark Twain are as this means the works are more accessible to more people at a l #{{note|Demonopolize Them}}Quoted in Mark Crispin Miller, `Demonopolize Them! A Call for a Broad-Based Movement Again40 KB (6,347 words) - 05:40, 13 June 2006
- ...]] MP | [[Ruth Kelly]] MP | Prof [[Ernesto Laclau]] (Essex University) | [[Mark Lazarowicz]] | Prof [[David Marquand]] | [[Alan Milburn]] MP | [[David Mili7 KB (947 words) - 10:33, 19 July 2016
- *[[Mark Q. Rhoads]] - [[US Internet Council]]47 KB (6,765 words) - 09:45, 14 October 2016
- * [[Mark Maslyn]], Executive Director, Public Policy2 KB (346 words) - 13:50, 4 September 2009
- ...Penny (D-MN); Sam Beard, Carolyn Weaver, Randy Clerihue, and Andrew Biggs. Mark Groombridge, Special Assistant, Office of the Under Secretary for Arms Cont38 KB (5,485 words) - 09:34, 14 October 2016
- Mark Perlman writes of the controversial connections between Erinys and Ahmed Ch ...t would end up undermining central authority over the vital oil sector<ref>Mark Perlman, [http://www.forward.com/articles/6335/ Apartheid Enforcers Guard I90 KB (13,438 words) - 14:39, 27 June 2011
- ...s_list/project-gl-ani-00-1.asp Reaching Out: AstraZeneca Anniversary] - to mark their first anniversary in June 2000, AstraZeneca reached out into their lo11 KB (1,491 words) - 11:44, 5 July 2016
- *[[Mark Bullough]] - 25000 ordinary shares held as at 26/03/2010. * [[Mark Bullough]]: Former Director19 KB (2,808 words) - 07:56, 22 March 2018
- ...classified contract to protect the CIA station in Kabul, Afghanistan.<ref>Mark Mazzetti, [http://www.nytimes.com/2009/08/20/us/20intel.html?_r=2&hp C.I.A. ...kwater as part of a programme to assassinate top [[Al Qaeda]] figures.<ref>Mark Mazzetti, [http://www.nytimes.com/2009/08/20/us/20intel.html?_r=2&hp C.I.A.5 KB (766 words) - 01:23, 3 November 2014
- *[[Mark Buckingham]] of [[Monsanto]]; chair3 KB (483 words) - 00:39, 21 November 2017
- ...er with [[John Beringer]], [[Julian Kinderlerer]], [[Alan McHughen]] and [[Mark Tepfer]], founded the [[International Society for Biosafety Research]] (ISB25 KB (3,523 words) - 16:31, 7 September 2009
- *Mark Drajem & Brian Wingfield [http://www.bloomberg.com/news/2012-11-02/union-b10 KB (1,384 words) - 11:30, 27 January 2017
- ...curity Secretary Tom Ridge and Food and Drug Administration Commissioner [[Mark McClellan]]. [[Carl Feldbaum]] was succeeded as BIO's President in 2004 by8 KB (1,154 words) - 16:35, 7 September 2009